Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:18-bk-00284

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stephani W Humrickhouse
Case #: 5:19-ap-00051
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2019
Terminated:Sep 30, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
ST Freight, LLC
Steven R. Schenian Registered Agent 500 American Drive
Francis Creek, WI 54214
Represented By
ST Freight, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
John C. Bircher III, Trustee
White & Allen, PA 1319 Commerce Drive PO Drawer U
New Bern, NC 28563
Represented By
Joseph Zachary Frost
Stubbs & Perdue, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Wayne Bailey, Inc.
P.O. Box 467
Chadbourn, NC 28431
Represented By
Joseph Zachary Frost
Stubbs & Perdue, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Monday, September 30, 2019
13 13 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 09/30 9:40 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to all defendants filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Mon 09/30 11:48 AM
Adversary Case 5:19-ap-51 Closed (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2019
12 12 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 09/19 12:56 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 09/18/2019. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11
Monday, September 16, 2019
11 11 order Compromise Mon 09/16 10:36 AM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise Related [+] (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-] 9
Wednesday, August 07, 2019
10 10 misc Certificate of Service (Not for Summons) Wed 08/07 11:21 AM
Certificate of Service filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of Wayne Bailey, Inc. Related [+]. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-] 9 Motion to Approve Compromise With ST Freight, LLC
9 9 motion Compromise Wed 08/07 11:00 AM
Motion to Approve Compromise With ST Freight, LLC filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2019
8 8 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Thu 07/04 1:16 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 07/03/2019. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7
Monday, July 01, 2019
7 7 order Consent Order (No Motion) Mon 07/01 2:17 PM
Stipulated Order of Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint Answer deadline reset for 7/22/2019 . (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2019
6 6 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Fri 06/21 1:08 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 06/20/2019. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5
Tuesday, June 18, 2019
5 5 order Consent Order (No Motion) Tue 06/18 12:22 PM
Stipulated Order of Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint. Defendant's Answer due by 6/20/2019. (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2019
4 4 order Directing Plaintiff to Proceed Fri 05/24 1:43 PM
Order Directing Plaintiff to Proceed After Failure to Answer Due by 6/17/2019. (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2019
3 3 misc Affidavit Thu 04/25 10:31 AM
Affidavit of Service filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc. Related [+]. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued (auto)
Friday, April 19, 2019
utility Set Deadline (Private) Fri 04/19 1:07 PM
Answer due by 05/20/2019 (adi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2019
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Thu 04/18 2:31 PM
Summons Issued on ST Freight, LLC Answer Due 05/20/2019 (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/18 2:31 PM
Adversary case 19-00051 5. Complaint by John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc. against ST Freight, LLC (Fee Paid) (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))),(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A