Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:18-bk-00284

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stephani W Humrickhouse
Case #: 5:19-ap-00054
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 18, 2019
Terminated:Jun 14, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
McKenzie Supply Company
726 East 16th Street
Lumberton, NC 28358
Represented By
McKenzie Supply Company
contact info
Plaintiff
John C. Bircher III, Trustee
White & Allen, PA 1319 Commerce Drive PO Drawer U
New Bern, NC 28563
Represented By
Joseph Zachary Frost
Stubbs & Perdue, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Wayne Bailey, Inc.
P.O. Box 467
Chadbourn, NC 28431
Represented By
Joseph Zachary Frost
Stubbs & Perdue, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Sunday, June 16, 2019
10 10 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case Mon 06/17 12:55 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case Notice Date 06/16/2019. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9
Friday, June 14, 2019
9 9 order Dismiss and Close AP (Compromise, Conversion, Dismissal of BK Case) Fri 06/14 2:46 PM
Order Dismissing and Closing Adversary Proceeding 5:19-ap-54 closed . (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2019
8 8 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 06/14 1:09 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 06/13/2019. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6
Wednesday, June 12, 2019
7 7 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 06/12 2:52 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to all defendants filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2019
6 6 order Compromise Tue 06/11 11:57 AM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise Related [+] (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-] 4
Thursday, May 09, 2019
5 5 misc Certificate of Service (Not for Summons) Thu 05/09 10:14 AM
Certificate of Service filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc. Related [+]. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-] 4 Motion to Approve Compromise With McKenzie Supply Company
4 4 motion Compromise Thu 05/09 10:13 AM
Motion to Approve Compromise With McKenzie Supply Company filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2019
3 3 misc Generic Filing (Misc./Free Text - ECF) Wed 05/08 10:41 AM
Notice of Settlement filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2019
utility Set Deadline (Private) Fri 04/19 1:07 PM
Answer due by 05/20/2019 (adi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2019
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Thu 04/18 3:50 PM
Summons Issued on McKenzie Supply Company Answer Due 05/20/2019 (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/18 3:50 PM
Adversary case 19-00054 5. Complaint by John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc. against McKenzie Supply Company (Fee Paid) (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A