Adler v. Aviation Inventory Resources, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-11015
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-11015
Louisiana Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Jerry A Brown |
Case #: | 2:19-ap-01077 |
Nature of Suit | 11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jan 10, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Aviation Inventory Resources, Inc.
P.O. Box 1999
Mansfielf, TX 76063 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David V. Adler
Post Office Box 55129
Metairie, LA 70055 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Friday, January 10, 2020 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 01/10 3:40 PM
Adversary Case Closed 2:19-ap-1077. (McGinn, S) |
||
Friday, September 13, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Order) (AP)
Fri 09/13 4:02 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Signed on September 13, 2019. (McGinn, S) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Motion) (AP)
Fri 09/13 11:12 AM
Ex Parte Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice Filed by David V. Adler (Laudumiey, Fernand) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued (AP)
Mon 04/22 8:58 AM
Summons Issued on Aviation Inventory Resources, Inc. Answer Due 5/22/2019. (McGinn, S) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/19 12:17 PM
Adversary case 19-01077 Complaint by David V. Adler against Aviation Inventory Resources, Inc.. Fee Amount $350. (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)),(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Laudumiey, Fernand) |