Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Virginia M Hernandez Cov
Referred: Sean P Flynn
Case #: 8:19-cv-00886
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause07:0006(b) Federal Commodity Exchange Regulation
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2019
Re-opened:Aug 11, 2022
Terminated:Dec 07, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Oct 12, 2019 4:21 AM EDT
Defendant
Bowling Green Capital Management, LLC
Defendant
Oasis International Group, Limited
Defendant
Raymond P. Montie, III
Represented By
Mark L. Horwitz
Law Offices Of Mark L. Horwitz, PA
contact info
Vincent Albert Citro
Law Offices Of Mark L. Horwitz, PA
contact info
Defendant
Mainstream Fund Services, Inc
Represented By
Christopher Walker
Lippes Mathias Wexler Friedman LLP
contact info
Scott S. Allen, Jr.
Lippes Mathias Wexler Friedman LLP
contact info
Dennis C. Vacco
Lippes, Mathias, Wexler & Friedman, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Lagoon Investments, Inc
Defendant
John J. Haas
Represented By
A. Brian Phillips
A. Brian Phillips, PA
contact info
Andrew C. Searle
A. Brian Phillips, PA
contact info
Defendant
Francisco "Frank" L. Duran
Represented By
Allan Lerner
Law Offices Of Allan M. Lerner, PA
contact info
Defendant
Michael J. Dacorta
13318 Lost Key Place
Lakewood Ranch, FL 34202
Represented By
Christopher Robert Kaigle
The Kaigle Law Firm, P.A.
contact info
Jacob Vickers Stuart, Jr.
Law Office Of Jacob Stuart
contact info
Defendant
Oasis Management, LLC
Defendant
Joseph S. Anile, II
Defendant
6922 Lacantera Circle, LLC
Defendant
4Oaks, LLC
Defendant
444 Gulf of Mexico Drive, LLC
Defendant
4064 Founders Club Drive, LLC
Defendant
13318 Lost Key Place, LLC
Defendant
Roar of the Lion Fitness, LLC
Defendant
Satellite Holdings Company
Represented By
A. Brian Phillips
A. Brian Phillips, PA
contact info
Andrew C. Searle
A. Brian Phillips, PA
contact info
Mediator
Peter J. Grilli
Represented By
Peter John Grilli
Peter J. Grilli, PA
contact info
Movant
United States of America
Represented By
Rachelle DesVaux Bedke
Us Attorney'S Office - Flm
contact info
Plaintiff
Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Represented By
J. Alison Auxter
Commodity Futures Trading Commission
contact info
Jo Mettenburg
Commodity Futures Trading Commission
contact info
Jennifer Chapin
Commodity Futures Trading Commission
contact info
J. Allison Auxter
Commodity Futures Trading Commission
contact info
Receiver
Burton W. Wiand
Court Appointed Receiver Wiand Guerra King P.A. 5505 W. Gray Street
Tampa, FL 33609
Represented By
Jared J. Perez
Wiand Guerra King, Pl
contact info
Eric Ryan Feld
Wiand Guerra King, Pl
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Sunday, May 04, 2025
865 865 notice Notice (Other) Sun 05/04 12:16 PM
NOTICE by Burton W. Wiand re864 Status report Notice of Filing Amended Exhibit A to Receiver's Twenty-Fourth Interim Report(Lockwood, Maya)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Amended Exhibit A
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
864 864 misc Status report Wed 04/30 9:00 PM
STATUS report Receiver's Twenty-Fourth Interim Report by Burton W. Wiand.(Lockwood, Maya)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Accounting Report,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Bank Accounts,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Property