Original Case: 8:19-cv-00886

Eleventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-usc-10132
Typeu.s. civil / u.s. plaintiff
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Case Filed:Jan 16, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jan 18, 2024 3:16 AM EST
SERVICE
Represented By
Gregory P. Holder
Zinober Diana and Monteverde PA
contact info
Lawrence Joseph Dougherty
Johnson Pope Bokor Ruppel & Burns, LLP
contact info
Ronald James Kurpiers II
Kurpiers Law Firm, PA
contact info
James D. Sallah
Sallah Astarita & Cox, LLC
contact info
Dennis C. Vacco
Lippes Mathias LLP
contact info
Ailen Cruz
Guerra & Partners, PA
contact info
David W.A. Chee
Carlton Fields, PA
contact info
Rachelle DesVaux Bedke
DOJ-USAO
contact info
Eric Ryan Feld
Guerra & Partners, PA
contact info
Jared J. Perez
Jared J. Perez, PA
contact info
Chemere Ellis
Guerra & Partners, PA
contact info
Charles F. Johnson III
Blalock Walters, PA
contact info
Christopher A. Walker
Lippes Mathias, LLP
contact info
Scott S. Allen Jr.
Lippes Mathias LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
MICHAEL J. DACORTA
Represented By
Michael J. Dacorta
FCI Coleman Low - Inmate Legal Mail
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
COMMODITY FUTURES TRADING COMMISSION
Represented By
Jeff C. Le Riche
U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission
contact info
J. Alison Auxter
U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/18/2024 3:16 AM EST
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Michael J. Dacorta on 01/05/2024. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 01/31/2024 as to Appellant Michael J. Dacorta. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/14/2024 as to Appellee Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs CIVIL - Notice of Docketing
Att: 2 5 pgs Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal
Att: 3 4 pgs USDC Judgment DE 781
Att: 4 46 pgs USDC Order DE 780