Member Case
Lead case is: 1:19-bk-11231

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michael E Wiles
Case #: 1:19-bk-11232
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2019
Terminated:Jan 25, 2023

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Scorpion Club Ventures LLC
220 Ffith Avenue
New York, NY 10001
Represented By
Scorpion Club Ventures LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014

GPO May 18 2020
Decision signed on 5/18/2020 granting motion to convert cases to chapter 7, denying motions for reconsideration and denying motion for additional order compelling rent payments. (See lead case 19-11231). (DePierola, Jacqueline)

Docket last updated: 04/21/2019 8:00 PM EDT
Monday, April 22, 2019
1 1 13 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 04/22 3:04 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered.Fee Amount $ 1717, Receipt Number 203975 Schedule A/B due 5/6/2019. Schedule D due 5/6/2019. Schedule E/F due 5/6/2019. Schedule H due 5/6/2019. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 5/6/2019. Statement of Financial Affairs due 5/6/2019. Incomplete Filings due by 5/6/2019, Chapter 11 Plan due by 8/20/2019, Disclosure Statement due by 8/20/2019, Initial Case Conference due by 5/22/2019, Filed by Scorpion Club Ventures LLC . (Porter, Minnie)
Related: [-]