New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michael E Wiles
Case #: 1:19-bk-11231
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2019
Terminated:Jan 25, 2023

TypeOther Entity Type
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Scorpion Fitness Inc
325 5th Ave Apt 41E
New York, NY 10016-5046
Represented By
Scorpion Fitness Inc
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014

GPO Apr 03 2020
Decision signed on 4/3/2020 denying pro se motion by John Shams to extend time to appeal from order approving the appointment of a chapter 11 trustee (related document(s)172). (DePierola, Jacqueline)
GPO May 18 2020
Decision signed on 5/18/2020 granting motion to convert cases to chapter 7, denying motions for reconsideration and denying motion for additional order compelling rent payments (related document(s)220, 209, 210, 203, 218, 197, 190, 206, 215, 204, 221, 208, 211, 219, 216). (DePierola, Jacqueline)

Docket last updated: 04/21/2019 8:00 PM EDT
Monday, April 22, 2019
misc Add Judge Mon 04/22 3:01 PM
Judge Michael E. Wiles added to the case. (Lewis, Tenille)
Related: [-]
misc Set Deficiency Deadlines Mon 04/22 3:14 PM
Deficiencies Set:Schedule A/B due 5/6/2019. Schedule D due 5/6/2019. Schedule E/F due 5/6/2019. Schedule H due 5/6/2019. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 5/6/2019. Statement of Financial Affairs due 5/6/2019. Incomplete Filings due by 5/6/2019, (Lewis, Tenille)
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 04/22 3:00 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered.Fee Amount $ 1717.00, Receipt Number 203974 Chapter 11 Plan due by 8/20/2019, Disclosure Statement due by 8/20/2019, Initial Case Conference due by 5/22/2019, Filed by Scorpion Fitness Inc . (Lewis, Tenille)
Related: [-]