Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:18-bk-00284

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stephani W Humrickhouse
Case #: 5:19-ap-00056
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2019
Terminated:Sep 27, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Gream Trucking, Inc.
Anthony Barone, Registered Agent 9944 S. Roberts Road Suite 204
Palos Hill, IL 60465
Represented By
Gream Trucking, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
John C. Bircher III, Trustee
White & Allen, PA 1319 Commerce Drive PO Drawer U
New Bern, NC 28563
Represented By
Joseph Zachary Frost
Stubbs & Perdue, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Wayne Bailey, Inc.
P.O. Box 467
Chadbourn, NC 28431
Represented By
Joseph Zachary Frost
Stubbs & Perdue, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Tuesday, August 31, 2021
21 21 court Writ Issued Tue 08/31 3:29 PM
Issued Writ of Execution. (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 01, 2020
20 20 misc Generic Filing (Misc./Free Text - ECF) Wed 04/01 8:46 AM
Notice of Settlement filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2019
admis Request for Certification of Judgment (Text) Thu 11/14 10:22 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Certification of Judgment for Registration in Another District (Fee 11) filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none (ADI) Thu 11/14 10:24 AM
Receipt Of Filing Fee For Request for Clerk to Issue Certification of Judgment for Registration in Another District([LINK 19-00056 5-SWH] ) [admis,certjud] ( 11.00), Receipt Number A15166827, Amount $ 11.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2019
misc Request for a Certified Copy Tue 10/29 2:07 PM
Request for a Certified Copy (Fee 11). The document will be sent via email to :clandis@stubbsperdue.com: filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc. Related [+]. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-] 15 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
misc Request for a Certified Copy Tue 10/29 2:08 PM
Request for a Certified Copy (Fee 11). The document will be sent via email to :clandis@stubbsperdue.com: filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc. Related [+]. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-] 19 Bill of Costs
crditcrd none (ADI) Tue 10/29 2:08 PM
Receipt Of Filing Fee For Request for a Certified Copy([LINK 19-00056 5-SWH] ) [misc,paycert] ( 11.00), Receipt Number A15128701, Amount $ 11.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none (ADI) Tue 10/29 2:08 PM
Receipt Of Filing Fee For Request for a Certified Copy([LINK 19-00056 5-SWH] ) [misc,paycert] ( 11.00), Receipt Number A15128701, Amount $ 11.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2019
19 19 court Bill of Costs Mon 10/28 11:42 AM
Bill of Costs Related [+] (Roberson, Tina)
Related: [-] 15 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Thursday, October 24, 2019
18 18 court Bill of Costs Thu 10/24 1:54 PM
Bill of Costs Related [+] filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-] 15 Order on Motion for Default Judgment15 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Friday, September 27, 2019
court Close Adversary Case Fri 09/27 12:39 PM
Adversary Case 5:19-ap-56 Closed (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2019
17 17 misc Generic Filing (Misc./Free Text - ECF) Tue 08/27 10:01 AM
Bill of Costs filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2019
16 16 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Thu 08/22 12:56 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 08/21/2019. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15
Monday, August 19, 2019
15 15 order Default Judgment Mon 08/19 1:27 PM
Order Granting Motion. Default Judgment as to Evelia Long d/b/a Little E Trucking , Gream Trucking, Inc. Related [+] (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-] 13
Tuesday, August 13, 2019
14 14 16 pgs misc Memorandum of Law Tue 08/13 2:15 PM
Memorandum of Law filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc. Related [+]. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-] 13 Motion for Default Judgment as to Gream Trucking, Inc.
13 13 motion Default Judgment Tue 08/13 2:11 PM
Motion for Default Judgment as to Gream Trucking, Inc. filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Sunday, August 04, 2019
12 12 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Mon 08/05 12:42 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 08/04/2019. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11
Friday, August 02, 2019
11 11 court Entry of Default Fri 08/02 10:54 AM
Entry of Default Related [+] (Parker, Wendy)
Related: [-] 10 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Plaintiff Wayne Bailey, Inc.
Wednesday, July 31, 2019
10 10 motion Entry of Default Wed 07/31 11:03 AM
Motion for Entry of Default as to Gream Trucking, Inc. filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 16, 2019
9 9 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Mon 06/17 12:55 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 06/16/2019. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8
Friday, June 14, 2019
8 8 2 pgs order Order (Generic) Fri 06/14 10:31 AM
Stipulated Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2019
7 7 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Thu 06/06 1:16 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 06/05/2019. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6
Monday, June 03, 2019
6 6 order Consent Order (No Motion) Mon 06/03 1:48 PM
Consent Order of Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint. Answer deadline reset for 6/12/2019 . (Brock, Anna)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2019
5 5 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Fri 05/31 1:32 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 05/30/2019. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4
Tuesday, May 28, 2019
4 4 order Directing Plaintiff to Proceed Tue 05/28 8:35 AM
Order Directing Plaintiff to Proceed After Failure to Answer Due by 6/19/2019. . (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2019
3 3 misc Affidavit Tue 04/30 9:47 AM
Affidavit of Service filed by Joseph Zachary Frost on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc. Related [+]. (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued (auto)
Tuesday, April 23, 2019
utility Set Deadline (Private) Tue 04/23 1:07 PM
Answer due by 05/22/2019 (adi)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2019
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Mon 04/22 3:37 PM
Summons Issued on Gream Trucking, Inc. Answer Due 05/22/2019 (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/22 3:37 PM
Adversary case 19-00056 5. Complaint by John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc. against Gream Trucking, Inc. (Fee Paid) (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Frost, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A