Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:18-bk-00284

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stephani W Humrickhouse
Case #: 5:19-ap-00058
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2019
Terminated:Jan 14, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Integrity Express Logistics LLC
4420 Cooper Road
Cincinnati, OH 45242
Represented By
Integrity Express Logistics LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Wayne Bailey, Inc.
Represented By
John C. Bircher, III
White & Allen, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
John C. Bircher III, Trustee
White & Allen, PA 1319 Commerce Drive PO Drawer U
New Bern, NC 28563
Represented By
John C. Bircher, III
White & Allen, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, January 14, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Tue 01/14 10:24 AM
Adversary Case 5:19-ap-58 Closed (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2020
21 21 notice Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 01/08 4:55 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Christopher J. Waivers on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee. (Waivers, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2019
20 20 order Compromise Mon 11/25 1:59 PM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise Related [+] (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-] 18
Thursday, November 21, 2019
utility Calendar - Remove Thu 11/21 2:57 PM
Note to Courtroom Deputy - Remove from Calendar - AP Settled Related [+] (Wright, Dawn)
Related: [-] ument no.16 Scheduling Order. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due: 9/20/2019. Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures due: 11/7/2019. Discovery due: 1/8/2020. Mediation Notification due 11/7/2019. Amendment(s) due by 12/6/2019. Motions due by 2/10/2020. Pretrial Order due by 3/18/2020. Trial date set for 3/26/2020 at 10:30 AM at Raleigh Courtroom. . (Howard, Allyson) **Corrective Entry: Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due: 9/ 30 /2019.** Modified on 8/26/2019 .
Monday, November 18, 2019
19 19 court Deficiency Notice - Attorney (AP) Mon 11/18 2:42 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Christopher J. Waivers. The referenced document has been filed; however, it is deficient as follows: An order granting the relief requested was not submitted as required by Local Rule 5005-4(4). Failure to correct the deficiencies by the date indicated may result in the court assuming you no longer desire the relief requested and entering an order denying or dismissing the requested relief. Related [+] Due by 12/2/2019. (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-] ument no.18 Motion to Approve Compromise With Integrity Express, LLC filed by John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.
Tuesday, October 22, 2019
18 18 motion Compromise Tue 10/22 4:06 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise With Integrity Express, LLC filed by Christopher J. Waivers on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee. (Waivers, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2019
17 17 utility Matter Scheduled/Added to Calendar Tue 08/20 3:27 PM
Matter Scheduled/Added to Calendar Trial: 3/26/2020 Related [+] (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-] ument no.16 Scheduling Order
16 16 order Scheduling Order Tue 08/20 3:25 PM
Scheduling Order. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due: 9/20/2019. Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures due: 11/7/2019. Discovery due: 1/8/2020. Mediation Notification due 11/7/2019. Amendment(s) due by 12/6/2019. Motions due by 2/10/2020. Pretrial Order due by 3/18/2020. Trial date set for 3/26/2020 at 10:30 AM at Raleigh Courtroom. . (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-]
15 15 court Hearing Cancelled Tue 08/20 11:42 AM
Notice Cancelling Hearing - Report Amended Related [+] (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-] 13 Order Setting Preliminary Pre-Trial Conference Preliminary Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/22/2019 at 10:00 AM at Raleigh Courtroom. .
14 14 admis Pre-Conference Report Tue 08/20 11:06 AM
Amended/Amendment To Pre-Conference Report filed by James S. Livermon III, Christopher J. Waivers on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee. (Waivers, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2019
13 13 order Preliminary Pre-Trial Conference Fri 08/02 12:09 PM
Order Setting Preliminary Pre-Trial Conference Preliminary Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/22/2019 at 10:00 AM at Raleigh Courtroom. . (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2019
12 12 admis Pre-Conference Report Thu 08/01 6:11 PM
Pre-Conference Report filed by James S. Livermon III, Christopher J. Waivers on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee Related [+]. (Waivers, Christopher)
Related: [-] 11 Order Directing Parties to File Joint Report
Wednesday, July 03, 2019
11 11 order Directing Filing of Joint Report Wed 07/03 3:22 PM
Order Directing Parties to File Joint Report Pre-Conference Report due by 8/2/2019. . (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-]
10 10 utility Calendar - Schedule Wed 07/03 2:42 PM
Note to Courtroom Deputy - Schedule Hearing Date Preliminary Pretrial Conference (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2019
9 9 court Corrected PDF Attachment Tue 07/02 1:42 PM
Corrected PDF Attachment Related [+] filed by James S. Livermon III on behalf of Integrity Express Logistics LLC. (Livermon, James)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Plaintiff Wayne Bailey, Inc.,8 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Integrity Express Logistics LLC1 Complaint,8 Answer to Complaint
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 07/02 1:24 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by James S. Livermon III on behalf of Integrity Express Logistics LLC. Responses due by 7/5/2019. (Livermon, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2019
7 7 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Sat 06/15 1:02 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 06/14/2019. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6
Wednesday, June 12, 2019
6 6 order Directing Plaintiff to Proceed Wed 06/12 7:49 AM
Order Directing Plaintiff to Proceed After Failure to Answer Due by 7/5/2019. . (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2019
utility Terminate Deadline (Public) Mon 06/10 9:58 AM
Deadline(s) Terminated. - Affidavit of Service Filed Related [+] (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-] ument no. 4 Deficiency Notice - Attorney (AP)
Friday, June 07, 2019
5 5 misc Affidavit Fri 06/07 9:59 AM
Affidavit of Service filed by John C. Bircher III on behalf of Wayne Bailey, Inc., John C. Bircher III, Trustee Related [+]. (Bircher, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, June 05, 2019
4 4 court Deficiency Notice - Attorney (AP) Wed 06/05 7:30 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE to John C. Bircher, III. The referenced document has been filed; however, it is deficient as follows: A certificate of service indicating service of the summons and complaint has not been filed. If service was not obtained on the defendant(s) within seven (7) days of issuance of the summons, a new summons will need to be issued. In that event, a new summons should be submitted to the court for reissuance. If service was obtained on the defendant(s), a certificate of service should immediately be filed with the court. Failure to either submit a new summons for reissuance or file a certificate of service of the summons previously issued may result in the matter being scheduled for dismissal pursuant to Local Rule 7055-1. Failure to correct the deficiencies by the date indicated may result in the court assuming you no longer desire the relief requested and entering an order denying or dismissing the requested relief. Due by 6/17/2019. (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2019
3 3 court Deficiency Notice - Attorney (AP) Fri 05/24 2:11 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE to John Bircher, III. The referenced document has been filed; however, it is deficient as follows: A certificate of service indicating service of the summons and complaint has not been filed. If service was not obtained on the defendant(s) within seven (7) days of issuance of the summons, a new summons will need to be issued. In that event, a new summons should be submitted to the court for reissuance. If service was obtained on the defendant(s), a certificate of service should immediately be filed with the court. Failure to either submit a new summons for reissuance or file a certificate of service of the summons previously issued may result in the matter being scheduled for dismissal pursuant to Local Rule 7055-1. Failure to correct the deficiencies by the date indicated may result in the court assuming you no longer desire the relief requested and entering an order denying or dismissing the requested relief. Due by 6/3/2019. (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2019
crditcrd none (ADI) Thu 04/25 1:19 PM
Receipt Of Filing Fee For Complaint 19-00058 5-SWH) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00), Receipt Number 14659576, Amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2019
utility Set Deadline (Private) Wed 04/24 1:07 PM
Answer due by 05/23/2019 (adi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2019
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 04/23 4:38 PM
Summons Issued on Integrity Express Logistics LLC Answer Due 05/23/2019 (Bircher, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/23 4:38 PM
Adversary case 19-00058 5. Complaint by Wayne Bailey, Inc., John C. Bircher III, Trustee against Integrity Express Logistics LLC (Fee Deferred) (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Bircher, John)
Related: [-]