Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:18-bk-00284

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stephani W Humrickhouse
Case #: 5:19-ap-00059
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2019
Terminated:Apr 30, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Whiteville Rentals Inc.
344 Vinson Boulevard
Whiteville, NC 28472
Represented By
Whiteville Rentals Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Wayne Bailey, Inc.
Represented By
John C. Bircher, III
White & Allen, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
John C. Bircher III, Trustee
White & Allen, PA 1319 Commerce Drive PO Drawer U
New Bern, NC 28563
Represented By
John C. Bircher, III
White & Allen, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Tuesday, April 30, 2019
court Close Adversary Case Tue 04/30 11:19 AM
Adversary Case 5:19-ap-59 Closed (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2019
4 4 misc Certificate of Service (Not for Summons) Thu 04/25 1:39 PM
Amended Certificate of Service filed by John C. Bircher III on behalf of Wayne Bailey, Inc., John C. Bircher III, Trustee Related [+]. (Bircher, John)
Related: [-] 3 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
3 3 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 04/25 1:21 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Whiteville Rentals Inc. filed by John C. Bircher III on behalf of Wayne Bailey, Inc., John C. Bircher III, Trustee. (Bircher, John)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none (ADI) Thu 04/25 1:19 PM
Receipt Of Filing Fee For Complaint 19-00059 5-SWH) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00), Receipt Number 14659576, Amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2019
utility Set Deadline (Private) Wed 04/24 1:07 PM
Answer due by 05/23/2019 (adi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2019
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 04/23 4:48 PM
Summons Issued on Whiteville Rentals Inc. Answer Due 05/23/2019 (Bircher, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/23 4:48 PM
Adversary case 19-00059 5. Complaint by Wayne Bailey, Inc., John C. Bircher III, Trustee against Whiteville Rentals Inc. (Fee Deferred) (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Bircher, John)
Related: [-]