Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:18-bk-00284

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stephani W Humrickhouse
Case #: 5:19-ap-00060
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2019
Terminated:Oct 10, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Jerry Turner
P.O. Box 264
Chadbourn, NC 28431
Represented By
Jerry Turner
contact info
Plaintiff
Wayne Bailey, Inc.
Represented By
John C. Bircher, III
White & Allen, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
John C. Bircher III, Trustee
White & Allen, PA 1319 Commerce Drive PO Drawer U
New Bern, NC 28563
Represented By
John C. Bircher, III
White & Allen, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, October 10, 2019
court Close Adversary Case Thu 10/10 2:26 PM
Adversary Case 5:19-ap-60 Closed (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2019
16 16 notice Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 10/09 3:33 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Christopher J. Waivers on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee. (Waivers, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2019
15 15 order Settlement Agreement Thu 08/29 10:40 AM
Order Granting Motion to Approve/Enforce Settlement Agreement Related [+] (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-] 8
Tuesday, August 27, 2019
14 14 audio Tue 08/27 1:20 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 8/27/2019 11:35:27 AM ]. File Size [ 1254 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:03:29 ]. (MOTION TO APPROVE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT). (admin)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2019
13 13 court Hearing Set (Motion) Mon 08/12 8:43 AM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 8/27/2019 at 11:30 AM at Raleigh Courtroom (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Approve/Enforce Settlement Agreement - with Jerry Turner filed by Plaintiff John C. Bircher III,
Friday, August 09, 2019
12 12 utility Calendar - Schedule Fri 08/09 11:07 AM
Note to Courtroom Deputy - Schedule Hearing Date Related [+] (Parker, Wendy)
Related: [-] ument no.8 Motion to Approve/Enforce Settlement Agreement filed by Plaintiff John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Plaintiff Wayne Bailey, Inc.
Friday, July 26, 2019
11 11 court Deficiency Notice - Attorney (AP) Fri 07/26 4:31 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE to John C. Bircher III. The referenced document has been filed; however, it is deficient as follows: An order granting the relief requested was not submitted as required by Local Rule 5005-4(4). Failure to correct the deficiencies by the date indicated may result in the court assuming you no longer desire the relief requested and entering an order denying or dismissing the requested relief. Related [+] Due by 8/5/2019. (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-] ument no.8 Motion to Approve/Enforce Settlement Agreement - with Jerry Turner filed by John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.
Friday, June 28, 2019
utility Terminate Deadline (Public) Fri 06/28 2:43 PM
Deadline(s) Terminated. - Certificate of Service Filed Related [+] (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-] ument no. 9 Deficiency Notice - Attorney (AP)
Thursday, June 27, 2019
10 10 misc Certificate of Service (Not for Summons) Thu 06/27 4:03 PM
Certificate of Service filed by John C. Bircher III on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc. Related [+]. (Bircher, John)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Approve/Enforce Settlement Agreement - with Jerry Turner
Wednesday, June 26, 2019
9 9 court Deficiency Notice - Attorney (AP) Wed 06/26 3:48 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE to John C. Bircher, III. The referenced document has been filed; however, it is deficient as follows: The certificate of service was omitted. Failure to correct the deficiencies by the date indicated may result in the court assuming you no longer desire the relief requested and entering an order denying or dismissing the requested relief. Related [+] Due by 7/19/2019. (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-] ument no.7 Motion to Approve/Enforce Settlement Agreement - with Jerry Turner filed by John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.,8 Motion to Approve/Enforce Settlement Agreement - with Jerry Turner filed by John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.
Tuesday, June 25, 2019
8 8 motion Settlement Agreement Tue 06/25 3:20 PM
Motion to Approve/Enforce Settlement Agreement - with Jerry Turner filed by John C. Bircher III on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Bircher, John)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Settlement Agreement Tue 06/25 3:18 PM
Motion to Approve/Enforce Settlement Agreement - with Jerry Turner filed by John C. Bircher III on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Bircher, John)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Deadline (Public) Tue 06/25 1:12 PM
Deadline(s) Terminated. Pre-Conference Report Not filed. Related [+] (Harris, Donna)
Related: [-] ument no.6 Order Directing Parties to File Joint Report
Friday, May 24, 2019
6 6 order Directing Filing of Joint Report Fri 05/24 12:30 PM
Order Directing Parties to File Joint Report Pre-Conference Report due by 6/24/2019. . (Wright, Dawn)
Related: [-]
5 5 utility Calendar - Schedule Fri 05/24 11:32 AM
Note to Courtroom Deputy - Schedule Hearing Date Preliminary Pre-Trial Conference (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2019
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 05/23 5:13 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by George M. Oliver on behalf of Jerry Turner. (Oliver, George)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2019
3 3 misc Affidavit Thu 05/02 4:54 PM
Affidavit of Service filed by John C. Bircher III on behalf of Wayne Bailey, Inc., John C. Bircher III, Trustee Related [+]. (Bircher, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, April 25, 2019
crditcrd none (ADI) Thu 04/25 1:19 PM
Receipt Of Filing Fee For Complaint 19-00060 5-SWH) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00), Receipt Number 14659576, Amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2019
utility Set Deadline (Private) Wed 04/24 1:07 PM
Answer due by 05/23/2019 (adi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2019
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 04/23 4:55 PM
Summons Issued on Jerry Turner Answer Due 05/23/2019 (Bircher, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/23 4:55 PM
Adversary case 19-00060 5. Complaint by Wayne Bailey, Inc., John C. Bircher III, Trustee against Jerry Turner (Fee Deferred) (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Bircher, John)
Related: [-]