VAN OYEN v. CWNEVADA LLC et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:19-bk-12300
Lead BK case is: 2:19-bk-12300
Nevada Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Mike K Nakagawa |
Case #: | 2:19-ap-01038 |
Nature of Suit | 72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other |
Case Filed: | Apr 25, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jun 13, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
CWNEVADA LLC, A NEVADA LLC
4145 ALI BABA LANE, SUITE A
LAS VEGAS, NV 89146 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
BRIAN PADGETT, AN INDIVIDUAL
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BCP HOLDING 7, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TIMOTHY SMITS VAN OYEN, AN INDIVIDUAL
LEE, HERNANDEZ, LANDRUM & CARLSON, APC 7575 VEGAS DRIVE, STE 150
LAS VEGAS, NV 89128 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Thursday, June 13, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 06/13 2:18 PM
Disposition and Closing of Adversary Case (ccc) |
|
Wednesday, June 05, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Dismissal (case)
Wed 06/05 10:29 AM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by DAVID S. LEE on behalf of TIMOTHY SMITS VAN OYEN (LEE, DAVID) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
court
Hearing Sched/Resched (Scheduling Conference)
Fri 04/26 8:27 AM
Scheduling Conference scheduled for 8/29/2019 at 10:00 AM at MKN-Courtroom 2, Foley Federal Bldg. (arv) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-docket of online payment
Thu 04/25 4:35 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Complaint 19-01038 mkn) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number 18836948, fee amount $ 350.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/25 4:34 PM
Adversary case 19-01038 Complaint for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction and Permanent Injunction Pursuant to FRBP 7001(7) Filed by Timothy Smits Van Oyen vs. CWNEVADA LLC, Brian Padgett, BCP Holding 7, LLC Fee Amount $350. (72 (Injunctive relief - other)(LEE, DAVID) |