Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-52717

Ohio Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John E Hoffman Jr
Case #: 2:19-ap-02031
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 26, 2019
Terminated:Apr 05, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Christopher J Henneforth
600 Morrison Road
Columbus, OH 43230
Represented By
Christopher J Henneforth
contact info
Plaintiff
Susan L Rhiel
PO Box 307337
Columbus, OH 43026
Represented By
James A Coutinho
Allen Stovall Neuman Fisher & Ashton LLP
contact info
Richard K Stovall
Allen Stovall Neuman Fisher & Ashton LLP
contact info
Rick L. Ashton
Allen Stovall Neuman Fisher & Ashton LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:10 PM EDT
Friday, October 04, 2024
court Receipt of Filing Fee - ADI Fri 10/04 6:30 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by AO. Receipt Number 20000396. (ad)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 14, 2022
25 25 BNC Certificate of Mailing - BNC Thu 12/15 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 12/14/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)24 Reassignment of Judge
Monday, December 12, 2022
24 24 court Reassignment of Judge Mon 12/12 4:05 PM
Notice of Reassignment of Judge. Involvement of Judge Jeffery P. Hopkins Terminated and Judge John E. Hoffman, Jr. Added to Case (cbe)
Related: [-]
23 23 court Reassignment of Judge Mon 12/12 4:03 PM
Disregard entered in error. Notice of Reassignment of Judge. Involvement of Judge John E. Hoffman, Jr. Terminated and Judge Jeffery P. Hopkins Added to Case (cbe) Modified on 12/12/2022 (cbe)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 05, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Tue 04/05 2:49 PM
Adversary Case 2:19-ap-2031 Closed (2km)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 29, 2022
22 22 notice Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Tue 03/29 12:42 PM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding With Prejudice Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Shafirstein, Tom)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 31, 2021
21 21 misc Witness List Fri 12/31 12:14 PM
Witness List Expert Witness Disclosure Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Shafirstein, Tom)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 06, 2021
20 20 misc Pretrial Statement Fri 08/06 9:04 AM
Joint Pretrial Statement Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel Related [+]. (Coutinho, James)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, March 15, 2021
19 19 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/15 2:14 PM
Answer to Complaint Answer of Defendant, Christopher J. Henneforth (Jury Demand Endorsed Hereon) Filed by Christopher J Henneforth. (Eppler, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 27, 2021
18 18 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC Sun 02/28 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 02/27/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)17 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Wednesday, February 24, 2021
17 17 order Default Judgment Thu 02/25 8:24 AM
Agreed Order (1) Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Default Judgment; (2) Denying Defendant's Motion for Leave to File a Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Perfect Service; and (3) Granting Defendant Leave to File an Answer Related [+], (2km)
Related: [-] 8 12
Tuesday, February 09, 2021
16 16 answer Response Tue 02/09 11:57 PM
Response to Related [+] Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel (Coutinho, James)
Related: [-] 12 Motion Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Instanter a Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Perfect Service filed by Defendant Christopher J Henneforth,13 Brief filed by Defendant Christopher J Henneforth,14 Affidavit filed by Defendant Christopher J Henneforth
Wednesday, February 03, 2021
15 15 notice Notice Wed 02/03 8:09 AM
Notice of Motion for Leave to File Instanter a Motion to Dismiss Filed by Defendant Christopher J Henneforth. (Eppler, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 02, 2021
14 14 misc Affidavit Tue 02/02 12:25 PM
Affidavit Re: Affidavit of Christopher J. Henneforth Filed by Defendant Christopher J Henneforth. (Eppler, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits to Affidavit of Christopher J. Henneforth
13 13 misc Brief Tue 02/02 12:23 PM
Brief Defendant's Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Defendant Christopher J Henneforth. (Eppler, Douglas)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Generic Motion Tue 02/02 11:53 AM
Motion Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Instanter a Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Perfect Service Filed by Defendant Christopher J Henneforth (Eppler, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Perfect Service
11 11 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 02/02 11:30 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Douglas Michael Eppler Filed by Defendant Christopher J Henneforth. (Eppler, Douglas)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 02/02 11:29 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Kirk W Roessler Filed by Defendant Christopher J Henneforth. (Roessler, Kirk)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 15, 2021
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Fri 01/15 12:48 PM
Certificate of Service SUPPLEMENTAL Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel Related [+]. (Coutinho, James)
Related: [-] 8 Motion for Default Judgment
Tuesday, January 12, 2021
8 8 motion Default Judgment Tue 01/12 10:31 AM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel (Coutinho, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2019
7 7 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 07/16 9:35 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of Co-Counsel for Plaintiff by Tom Shafirstein Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Shafirstein, Tom)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2019
6 6 misc Brief Tue 07/02 8:37 PM
Brief Amicus Curiae Filed by Interested Party Angela Dodd United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Dodd, Angela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: Complaint SEC v. Hadsell
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Thursday, May 02, 2019
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 05/02 2:53 PM
Summons Service Executed on Christopher J Henneforth 5/2/2019 (Stovall, Richard)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Summons Issued Thu 05/02 2:47 PM
Summons Issued on Christopher J Henneforth Date Issued 5/2/2019, Answer Due 06/3/2019 (Stovall, Richard)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 27, 2019
3 3 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Sat 04/27 4:31 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of Co-Counsel for Plaintiff by Rick L. Ashton Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Ashton, Rick)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Sat 04/27 2:05 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by James A Coutinho Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Coutinho, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2019
1 1 20 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 04/26 6:57 PM
Adversary case 2:19-ap-02031. (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Susan L Rhiel against Christopher J. Henneforth. Receipt Number DEFER, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred (Stovall, Richard) Modified to add middle initial of Defendant on 4/29/2019 (2dp)
Related: [-]