Ohio Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John E Hoffman Jr
Case #: 2:17-bk-52717
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2017
Creditor Meeting:Jun 06, 2017
Claims Deadline:Aug 24, 2017
Terminated:Jan 06, 2025

Debtor
Hadsell Chemical Processing, LLC
9329 State Route 220
Waverly, OH 45690-9012
Represented By
Daniel J Hunter
Allen Kuehnle Stovall & Neuman LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Larry J McClatchey
65 East State Street Suite 1800
Columbus, OH 43215
Trustee
Susan L Rhiel
P.O. Box 307337
Columbus, OH 43230
Represented By
Jeffrey Mark Levinson
Levinson LLP
contact info
Tom Shafirstein
Allen Stovall Neuman & Ashton LLP
contact info
Beth M. Miller
The Law Office Of Beth M. Miller, LLC
contact info
Rick L. Ashton
Allen Stovall Neuman & Ashton LLP
contact info
James A Coutinho
Allen Stovall Neuman & Ashton LLP
contact info
Richard K Stovall
Allen Stovall Neuman & Ashton LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Asst US Trustee (Col)
Office of the US Trustee 170 North High Street Suite 200
Columbus, OH 43215
Represented By
Pamela Arndt
Doj-Ust
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/12/2024 12:07 PM EDT
Friday, April 28, 2017
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Fri 04/28 11:43 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(2:17-bk-52717) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt Number 32408537, amount $ 335.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
court Auto Assignment (7 Business Asset) Fri 04/28 11:43 AM
Auto Assignment of Judge and Trustee with Meeting of Creditors to Be Noticed for 05/26/2017 at 02:00 PM at Columbus 341.Proof of Claim due by 08/24/2017. (Hunter, Daniel)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Fri 04/28 11:42 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Fee Amount $335 Filed by Hadsell Chemical Processing, LLC Atty Disclosure Statement due 05/12/2017. Schedule A/B Due: 05/12/2017. Schedule D Due: 05/12/2017. Schedule E/F Due: 05/12/2017. Schedule G Due: 05/12/2017. Schedule H Due: 05/12/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs Due: 05/12/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities Due: 05/12/2017. Incomplete Filings Due: 05/12/2017. (Hunter, Daniel)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Verification of Creditor Matrix Fri 04/28 11:42 AM
Verification of Creditor Matrix Filed by Debtor Hadsell Chemical Processing, LLC. (Hunter, Daniel)
Related: [-]
3 3 trustee Appointment Rejection Fri 04/28 12:58 PM
Trustee's Rejection of Appointment . (McClatchey, Larry)
Related: [-]
4 4 trustee Appointment of Successor Trustee Fri 04/28 2:25 AM
Appointment of Successor Trustee Larry J McClatchey removed and Susan L Rhiel added to the case. 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/6/2017 at 01:30 PM at Columbus 341. (Asst US Trustee (Col))
Related: [-]