Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-52717

Ohio Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John E Hoffman Jr
Case #: 2:19-ap-02032
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 26, 2019
Terminated:Mar 22, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Milan B Herceg
10152 Archer Lane
Dublin, OH 43017
Represented By
Milan B Herceg
contact info
Plaintiff
Susan L Rhiel
PO Box 307337
Columbus, OH 43026
Represented By
Richard K Stovall
Allen Stovall Neuman Fisher & Ashton LLP
contact info
Rick L. Ashton
Allen Stovall Neuman Fisher & Ashton LLP
contact info
James A Coutinho
Allen Stovall Neuman Fisher & Ashton LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:10 PM EDT
Friday, October 04, 2024
court Receipt of Filing Fee - ADI Fri 10/04 6:30 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by AO. Receipt Number 20000396. (ad)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 22, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Mon 03/22 8:38 AM
Adversary Case 2:19-ap-2032 Closed (2km)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 05, 2021
11 11 notice Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Fri 03/05 9:39 AM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding With Prejudice Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Coutinho, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2019
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 09/11 11:56 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Milan B Herceg. (Whittaker, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2019
9 9 misc Stipulation Fri 08/02 10:28 AM
Stipulation with Susan L. Rhiel, Trustee and Milan B. Herceg as to Extension of Time to Respond Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Stovall, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2019
8 8 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 07/16 9:36 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of Co-Counsel for Plaintiff by Tom Shafirstein Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Shafirstein, Tom)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2019
7 7 misc Brief Tue 07/02 8:47 PM
Brief Amicus Curiae Filed by Interested Party Angela Dodd United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Dodd, Angela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: Complaint SEC v. Hadsell
Att: 2 Exhibit Certficiate of Service
Friday, May 31, 2019
6 6 misc Stipulation Fri 05/31 2:29 PM
Stipulation with Susan L. Rhiel, Chapter 7 Trustee and Milan B. Herceg as to Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Stovall, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2019
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 05/02 2:58 PM
Summons Service Executed on Milan B Herceg 5/2/2019 (Stovall, Richard)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Summons Issued Thu 05/02 2:57 PM
Summons Issued on Milan B Herceg Date Issued 5/2/2019, Answer Due 06/3/2019 (Stovall, Richard)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 27, 2019
3 3 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Sat 04/27 4:33 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of Co-Counsel for Plaintiff by Rick L. Ashton Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Ashton, Rick)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Sat 04/27 2:09 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of Co-Counsel for Plaintiff by James A Coutinho Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Coutinho, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 04/26 7:18 PM
Adversary case 2:19-ap-02032. (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Susan L Rhiel against Milan B. Herceg. Receipt Number DEFER, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred (Stovall, Richard) Modified to add middle initial of Defendant on 4/29/2019 (2dp)
Related: [-]