Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-52717

Ohio Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John E Hoffman Jr
Case #: 2:19-ap-02036
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 27, 2019
Terminated:Sep 05, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Rhonda L Bame
400 Sunset Drive
Ashland, KY 41101
Represented By
Rhonda L Bame
contact info
Plaintiff
Susan L Rhiel
PO Box 307337
Columbus, OH 43026
Represented By
James A Coutinho
Allen Stovall Neuman Fisher & Ashton LLP
contact info
Rick L. Ashton
Allen Stovall Neuman Fisher & Ashton LLP
contact info
Richard K Stovall
Allen Stovall Neuman Fisher & Ashton LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:10 PM EDT
Friday, October 04, 2024
court Receipt of Filing Fee - ADI Fri 10/04 6:30 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by AO. Receipt Number 20000396. (ad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
utility Disposition of Adversary Tue 09/05 10:43 AM
Disposition of Adversary 2:19-ap-2036 (dap)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 09/05 10:45 AM
Adversary Case 2:19-ap-2036 Closed (dap)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 21, 2023
15 15 notice Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Mon 08/21 2:26 PM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Shafirstein, Tom)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 19, 2023
court Hearing Canceled Wed 04/19 8:51 AM
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 25, 2023
14 14 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC Sun 03/26 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 03/25/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)13 Scheduling Order
Thursday, March 23, 2023
13 13 order Scheduling Order Thu 03/23 10:38 AM
General Pretrial Order and Notice of Pretrial Conference. Pretrial conference set for 4/18/2023 at 10:00 AM Judge Hoffman Courtroom A for1 , Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 4/13/2023. Related [+]. (jms)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel
Tuesday, July 23, 2019
12 12 misc Substitute PDF Tue 07/23 3:15 PM
Substitute PDF Filed by Defendant Rhonda L Bame Related [+]. (Bentley, Richard)
Related: [-] 9 Answer to Complaint,10 Regarding Deficient Filing
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
Friday, July 19, 2019
11 11 BNC Certificate of Mailing - BNC Sat 07/20 12:25 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 07/19/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)10 Regarding Deficient Filing
Wednesday, July 17, 2019
10 10 order Regarding Deficient Filing Wed 07/17 9:05 AM
Notice of Deficient Filing and Order Setting Deadline for Compliance Regarding: Related [+]. Substitution of PDF Due: 7/31/2019. (2dp)
Related: [-] 9 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Rhonda L Bame
Tuesday, July 16, 2019
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 07/16 2:41 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Rhonda L Bame. (Bentley, Richard)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 07/16 9:13 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of Co-Counsel for Plaintiff by Tom Shafirstein Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Shafirstein, Tom)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2019
7 7 misc Brief Tue 07/02 6:58 PM
Brief Amicus Curiae Filed by Interested Party Angela Dodd United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Dodd, Angela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: Complaint SEC v. Hadsell
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Thursday, May 30, 2019
6 6 misc Stipulation Thu 05/30 11:36 AM
Stipulation with Susan L. Rhiel, Chapter 7 Trustee and Rhonda L. Bame as to Extension of Time to Respond Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Stovall, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2019
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 05/02 3:15 PM
Summons Service Executed on Rhonda L Bame 5/2/2019 (Stovall, Richard)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Summons Issued Thu 05/02 3:14 PM
Summons Issued on Rhonda L Bame Date Issued 5/2/2019, Answer Due 06/3/2019 (Stovall, Richard)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 27, 2019
3 3 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Sat 04/27 4:42 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of Co-Counsel for Plaintiff by Rick L. Ashton Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Ashton, Rick)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Sat 04/27 2:28 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of Co-Counsel for Plaintiff by James A Coutinho Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Coutinho, James)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Sat 04/27 12:25 PM
Adversary case 2:19-ap-02036. (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Susan L Rhiel against Rhonda L. Bame. Receipt Number DEFER, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred (Stovall, Richard) Modified to add middle initial of Defendant on 4/29/2019 (2dp)
Related: [-]