Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-52717

Ohio Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John E Hoffman Jr
Case #: 2:19-ap-02037
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 27, 2019
Terminated:Apr 05, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Christina Britton
7355 Southfield Rd
New Albany, OH 43054
Represented By
Christina Britton
contact info
Defendant
AdvantaIRA Trust, LLC
FBO Christina Britton 1520 Royal Palm Square Blvd. #320
Fort Meyers, FL 33919
Represented By
AdvantaIRA Trust, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Susan L Rhiel
PO Box 307337
Columbus, OH 43026
Represented By
Richard K Stovall
Allen Stovall Neuman Fisher & Ashton LLP
contact info
Rick L. Ashton
Allen Stovall Neuman Fisher & Ashton LLP
contact info
James A Coutinho
Allen Stovall Neuman Fisher & Ashton LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:10 PM EDT
Friday, October 04, 2024
court Receipt of Filing Fee - ADI Fri 10/04 6:30 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by AO. Receipt Number 20000396. (ad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 05, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Tue 04/05 2:51 PM
Adversary Case 2:19-ap-2037 Closed (2km)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 05, 2021
12 12 notice Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Fri 03/05 9:34 AM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding With Prejudice Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Coutinho, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2019
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 09/11 11:59 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Christina Britton. (Whittaker, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2019
10 10 misc Stipulation Fri 08/02 10:26 AM
Stipulation with Susan L. Rhiel, Trustee and Christina Britton and AdvantaIRA Trust, LLC as to Extension of Time to Respond Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Stovall, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2019
9 9 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 07/16 9:22 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of Co-Counsel for Plaintiff by Tom Shafirstein Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Shafirstein, Tom)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2019
8 8 misc Brief Tue 07/02 7:28 PM
Brief Amicus Curiae Filed by Interested Party Angela Dodd United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Dodd, Angela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: Complaint SEC v. Hadsell
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Friday, May 31, 2019
7 7 misc Stipulation Fri 05/31 2:24 PM
Stipulation with Susan L. Rhiel, Chapter 7 Trustee, Christina Britton and AdvantaIRA Trust, LLC as to Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Stovall, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2019
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 05/03 2:18 PM
Summons Service Executed on AdvantaIRA Trust, LLC 5/2/2019; Christina Britton 5/2/2019 (Stovall, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2019
5 5 misc Summons Issued and Served Thu 05/02 3:19 PM
Summons(es) on AdvantaIRA Trust, LLC Issued On 5/2/2019, and Answer Due On 06/3/2019; Christina Britton Issued On 5/2/2019, and Answer Due On 06/3/2019 (Stovall, Richard) Modified on 5/3/2019 (2dp)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Summons Issued Thu 05/02 3:19 PM
Summons Issued on AdvantaIRA Trust, LLC Date Issued 5/2/2019, Answer Due 06/3/2019; Christina Britton Date Issued 5/2/2019, Answer Due 06/3/2019 (Stovall, Richard)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 27, 2019
3 3 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Sat 04/27 4:44 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of Co-Counsel for Plaintiff by Rick L. Ashton Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Ashton, Rick)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Sat 04/27 2:32 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of Co-Counsel for Plaintiff by James A Coutinho Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Coutinho, James)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Sat 04/27 12:36 PM
Adversary case 2:19-ap-02037. (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Susan L Rhiel against Christina Britton, AdvantaIRA Trust, LLC. Receipt Number DEFER, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred (Stovall, Richard)
Related: [-]