Rhiel v. Kovack
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-52717
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-52717
Ohio Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | John E Hoffman Jr |
Case #: | 2:19-ap-02041 |
Nature of Suit | 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Apr 27, 2019 |
Terminated: | Apr 15, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Thomas Kovack
8239 Bilbury Lane
Dublin, OH 43016 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Susan L Rhiel
PO Box 307337
Columbus, OH 43026 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:10 PM EDT |
Friday, October 04, 2024 | ||
court
Receipt of Filing Fee - ADI
Fri 10/04 6:30 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by AO. Receipt Number 20000396. (ad) |
||
Friday, April 15, 2022 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 04/15 7:45 AM
Adversary Case 2:19-ap-2041 Closed (2km) |
||
Saturday, April 02, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 04/02/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, March 31, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Judgment Entry Granting Motion for Default Judgment (2km) |
|
Monday, May 10, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel (Shafirstein, Tom) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of Co-Counsel for Plaintiff by Tom Shafirstein Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Shafirstein, Tom) |
|
Tuesday, July 02, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Brief Amicus Curiae Filed by Interested Party Angela Dodd United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Dodd, Angela) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Thursday, May 02, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Summons Service Executed on Thomas Kovack 5/2/2019 (Stovall, Richard) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Summons Issued on Thomas Kovack Date Issued 5/2/2019, Answer Due 06/3/2019 (Stovall, Richard) |
|
Saturday, April 27, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of Co-Counsel for Plaintiff by Rick L. Ashton Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Ashton, Rick) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of Co-Counsel for Plaintiff by James A Coutinho Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Coutinho, James) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 2:19-ap-02041. (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Susan L Rhiel against Thomas Kovack. Receipt Number DEFER, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred (Stovall, Richard) |