Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-52717

Ohio Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John E Hoffman Jr
Case #: 2:19-ap-02042
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 27, 2019
Terminated:Jan 07, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Brian L. Morris
980 Willow Bluff Dr.
Columbus, OH 43235
Represented By
Brian L. Morris
contact info
Defendant
Beth Wittman
980 Willow Bluff Dr.
Columbus, OH 43235
Represented By
Beth Wittman
contact info
Plaintiff
Susan L Rhiel
PO Box 307337
Columbus, OH 43026
Represented By
Richard K Stovall
Allen Stovall Neuman Fisher & Ashton LLP
contact info
Rick L. Ashton
Allen Stovall Neuman Fisher & Ashton LLP
contact info
James A Coutinho
Allen Stovall Neuman Fisher & Ashton LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:10 PM EDT
Friday, October 04, 2024
court Receipt of Filing Fee - ADI Fri 10/04 6:30 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by AO. Receipt Number 20000396. (ad)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 07, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Thu 01/07 8:59 AM
Adversary Case 2:19-ap-2042 Closed (2km)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 13, 2020
15 15 notice Notice of Dismissal (AP) Fri 11/13 10:58 AM
Notice of Dismissal (AP) Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Coutinho, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2019
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 12/04 2:23 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Brian L. Morris, Beth Wittman. (Giberson, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2019
13 13 misc Stipulation Mon 11/04 5:24 PM
Stipulation with Susan L. Rhiel, Chapter 7 Trustee, Brian Morris and Beth Wittman as to Fifth Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to the Complaint Filed by Defendants Brian L. Morris, Beth Wittman, Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Giberson, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2019
12 12 misc Stipulation Fri 10/04 9:43 AM
Stipulation with Susan L. Rhiel, Chapter 7 Trustee, Brian Morris and Beth Wittman as to Fourth Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to the Complaint Filed by Defendants Brian L. Morris, Beth Wittman, Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Giberson, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2019
11 11 misc Stipulation Tue 09/03 12:45 PM
Stipulation with Susan L. Rhiel, Chapter 7 Trustee, Brian Morris and Beth Wittman as to Third Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Filed by Defendants Brian L. Morris, Beth Wittman, Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Giberson, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2019
10 10 misc Stipulation Tue 07/30 5:37 PM
Stipulation with Susan L. Rhiel, Chapter 7 Trustee, Brian Morris and Beth Wittman as to Second Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to the Complaint Filed by Defendants Brian L. Morris, Beth Wittman, Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Giberson, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2019
9 9 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 07/16 9:52 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of Co-Counsel for Plaintiff by Tom Shafirstein Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Shafirstein, Tom)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2019
8 8 misc Brief Tue 07/02 9:29 PM
Brief Amicus Curiae Filed by Interested Party Angela Dodd United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Dodd, Angela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: Complaint SEC v. Hadsell
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Friday, May 31, 2019
7 7 misc Stipulation Fri 05/31 1:29 PM
Stipulation with Chapter 7 Trustee, Brian Morris and Beth Wittman as to Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to the Complaint Filed by Defendants Brian L. Morris, Beth Wittman. (Giberson, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2019
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 05/02 3:58 PM
Summons Service Executed on Brian L. Morris 5/2/2019; Beth Wittman 5/2/2019 (Stovall, Richard)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Summons Issued Thu 05/02 3:57 PM
Summons Issued on Brian L. Morris Date Issued 5/2/2019, Answer Due 06/3/2019; Beth Wittman Date Issued 5/2/2019, Answer Due 06/3/2019 (Stovall, Richard)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 27, 2019
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Sat 04/27 9:06 PM
Amended Complaint by Richard K Stovall on behalf of Susan L Rhiel against all defendants. Related [+]. (Stovall, Richard)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 2:19-ap-02042. (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Susan L Rhiel against Brian L. Morris, Beth Wittman. Receipt Number DEFER, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel
3 3 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Sat 04/27 5:51 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of Co-Counsel for Plaintiff by Rick L. Ashton Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Ashton, Rick)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Sat 04/27 4:00 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of Co-Counsel for Plaintiff by James A Coutinho Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Coutinho, James)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Sat 04/27 1:22 PM
Adversary case 2:19-ap-02042. (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Susan L Rhiel against Brian L. Morris, Beth Wittman. Receipt Number DEFER, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred (Stovall, Richard)
Related: [-]