Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-52717

Ohio Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John E Hoffman Jr
Case #: 2:19-ap-02045
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 27, 2019
Terminated:Jul 15, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Mark Stanley, D.O.
7801 Lanham Ct.
Dublin, OH 43016
Represented By
Mark Stanley, D.O.
contact info
Plaintiff
Susan L Rhiel
PO Box 307337
Columbus, OH 43026
Represented By
Rick L. Ashton
Allen Stovall Neuman Fisher & Ashton LLP
contact info
James A Coutinho
Allen Stovall Neuman Fisher & Ashton LLP
contact info
Richard K Stovall
Allen Stovall Neuman Fisher & Ashton LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:10 PM EDT
Friday, October 04, 2024
court Receipt of Filing Fee - ADI Fri 10/04 6:30 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by AO. Receipt Number 20000396. (ad)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 15, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Fri 07/15 3:15 PM
Adversary Case 2:19-ap-2045 Closed (kam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 12, 2022
13 13 notice Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Tue 07/12 11:14 AM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Shafirstein, Tom)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2019
12 12 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 07/16 10:02 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of Co-Counsel for Plaintiff by Tom Shafirstein Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Shafirstein, Tom)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2019
11 11 misc Brief Tue 07/02 10:03 PM
Brief Amicus Curiae Filed by Interested Party Angela Dodd United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Dodd, Angela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: Complaint SEC v. Hadsell
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, June 19, 2019
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 06/19 1:38 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Mark Stanley, D.O.. (Sams, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2019
9 9 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 06/07 2:30 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Jeffrey B Sams Filed by Defendant Mark Stanley, D.O.. (Sams, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2019
8 8 misc Stipulation Wed 05/29 10:45 AM
Stipulation with Susan L. Rhiel, Trustee and Mark Stanley, D.O. as to Extension of Time Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Coutinho, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2019
7 7 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 05/23 9:00 AM
Summons Service Executed on Mark Stanley, D.O. 5/23/2019 (Coutinho, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2019
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 05/02 4:14 PM
Summons Service Executed on Mark Stanley, D.O. 5/2/2019 (Stovall, Richard)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Summons Issued Thu 05/02 4:13 PM
Summons Issued on Mark Stanley, D.O. Date Issued 5/2/2019, Answer Due 06/3/2019 (Stovall, Richard)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 27, 2019
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Sat 04/27 9:05 PM
Amended Complaint by Richard K Stovall on behalf of Susan L Rhiel against all defendants. Related [+]. (Stovall, Richard)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 2:19-ap-02045. (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Susan L Rhiel against Mark Stanley, D.O.. Receipt Number DEFER, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel
3 3 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Sat 04/27 6:00 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of Co-Counsel for Plaintiff by Rick L. Ashton Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Ashton, Rick)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Sat 04/27 4:19 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of Co-Counsel for Plaintiff by James A Coutinho Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Coutinho, James)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Sat 04/27 3:39 PM
Adversary case 2:19-ap-02045. (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Susan L Rhiel against Mark Stanley, D.O.. Receipt Number DEFER, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred (Stovall, Richard)
Related: [-]