Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-52717

Ohio Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John E Hoffman Jr
Case #: 2:19-ap-02049
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 27, 2019
Terminated:Jan 07, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
David Cox
7361 Mapleleaf Blvd.
Columbus, OH 43235
Represented By
David Cox
contact info
Plaintiff
Susan L Rhiel
PO Box 307337
Columbus, OH 43026
Represented By
James A Coutinho
Allen Stovall Neuman Fisher & Ashton LLP
contact info
Rick L. Ashton
Allen Stovall Neuman Fisher & Ashton LLP
contact info
Richard K Stovall
Allen Stovall Neuman Fisher & Ashton LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:10 PM EDT
Friday, October 04, 2024
court Receipt of Filing Fee - ADI Fri 10/04 6:30 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by AO. Receipt Number 20000396. (ad)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 07, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Thu 01/07 9:01 AM
Adversary Case 2:19-ap-2049 Closed (2km)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 13, 2020
14 14 notice Notice of Dismissal (AP) Fri 11/13 10:57 AM
Notice of Dismissal (AP) Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Coutinho, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2019
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 12/04 2:32 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by David Cox. (Giberson, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2019
12 12 misc Stipulation Mon 11/04 5:28 PM
Stipulation with Susan L. Rhiel, Chapter 7 Trustee, and David Cox as to Fifth Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Filed by Defendant David Cox, Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Giberson, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2019
11 11 misc Stipulation Fri 10/04 9:46 AM
Stipulation with Susan L. Rhiel, Chapter 7 Trustee, and David Cox as to Fourth Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Filed by Defendant David Cox, Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Giberson, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2019
10 10 misc Stipulation Tue 09/03 12:41 PM
Stipulation with Susan L. Rhiel, Chapter 7 Trustee, and David Cox as to Third Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Filed by Defendant David Cox, Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Giberson, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2019
9 9 misc Stipulation Tue 07/30 5:32 PM
Stipulation with Susan L. Rhiel, Chapter 7 Trustee, and David Cox as to Second Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Filed by Defendant David Cox, Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Giberson, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2019
8 8 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 07/16 9:26 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of Co-Counsel for Plaintiff by Tom Shafirstein Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Shafirstein, Tom)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2019
7 7 misc Brief Tue 07/02 7:52 PM
Brief Amicus Curiae Filed by Interested Party Angela Dodd United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Dodd, Angela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: Complaint SEC v. Hadsell
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Friday, May 31, 2019
6 6 misc Stipulation Fri 05/31 1:24 PM
Stipulation with Susan L. Rhiel, Chapter 7 Trustee, and David Cox as to Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Filed by Defendant David Cox. (Giberson, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2019
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 05/02 4:28 PM
Summons Service Executed on David Cox 5/2/2019 (Stovall, Richard)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Summons Issued Thu 05/02 4:27 PM
Summons Issued on David Cox Date Issued 5/2/2019, Answer Due 06/3/2019 (Stovall, Richard)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 27, 2019
3 3 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Sat 04/27 6:59 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of Co-Counsel for Plaintiff by Rick L. Ashton Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Ashton, Rick)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Sat 04/27 6:51 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of Co-Counsel for Plaintiff by James A Coutinho Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Coutinho, James)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Sat 04/27 5:04 PM
Adversary case 2:19-ap-02049. (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Susan L Rhiel against David Cox. Receipt Number DEFER, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred (Stovall, Richard)
Related: [-]