Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-52717

Ohio Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John E Hoffman Jr
Case #: 2:19-ap-02050
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 27, 2019
Terminated:Apr 15, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Dawn M Stanislaw, Individually and as Trustee of Dawn M. Stanislaw Living Trust
4254 N. Richmond St.
Chicago, IL 60618
Represented By
Dawn M Stanislaw
contact info
Plaintiff
Susan L Rhiel
PO Box 307337
Columbus, OH 43026
Represented By
Rick L. Ashton
Allen Stovall Neuman Fisher & Ashton LLP
contact info
Richard K Stovall
Allen Stovall Neuman Fisher & Ashton LLP
contact info
James A Coutinho
Allen Stovall Neuman Fisher & Ashton LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:10 PM EDT
Friday, October 04, 2024
court Receipt of Filing Fee - ADI Fri 10/04 6:30 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by AO. Receipt Number 20000396. (ad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 10, 2022
11 11 misc Document Tue 05/10 10:22 AM
Document Satisfaction of Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel Related [+]. (Shafirstein, Tom)
Related: [-] 9 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Friday, April 15, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Fri 04/15 7:49 AM
Adversary Case 2:19-ap-2050 Closed (2km)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 02, 2022
10 10 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC Sun 04/03 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 04/02/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)9 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Thursday, March 31, 2022
9 9 order Default Judgment Thu 03/31 2:54 PM
Judgment Entry Granting Motion for Default Judgment Related [+] (2km)
Related: [-] 8
Monday, July 19, 2021
8 8 motion Default Judgment Mon 07/19 3:49 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel (Shafirstein, Tom)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2019
7 7 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 07/16 10:00 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of Co-Counsel for Plaintiff by Tom Shafirstein Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Shafirstein, Tom)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2019
6 6 misc Brief Tue 07/02 7:57 PM
Brief Amicus Curiae Filed by Interested Party Angela Dodd United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Dodd, Angela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: Complaint SEC v. Hadsell
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Thursday, May 02, 2019
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 05/02 4:31 PM
Summons Service Executed on Dawn M Stanislaw 5/2/2019 (Stovall, Richard)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Summons Issued Thu 05/02 4:31 PM
Summons Issued on Dawn M Stanislaw Date Issued 5/2/2019, Answer Due 06/3/2019 (Stovall, Richard)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 27, 2019
3 3 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Sat 04/27 7:01 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of Co-Counsel for Plaintiff by Rick L. Ashton Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Ashton, Rick)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Sat 04/27 6:53 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of Co-Counsel for Plaintiff by James A Coutinho Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Coutinho, James)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Sat 04/27 5:10 PM
Adversary case 2:19-ap-02050. (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Susan L Rhiel against Dawn M Stanislaw. Receipt Number DEFER, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred (Stovall, Richard)
Related: [-]