Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-52717

Ohio Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John E Hoffman Jr
Case #: 2:19-ap-02051
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 27, 2019
Terminated:Sep 05, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
James Kratzenberg
2529 South 11th Street
Ironton, OH 45638
Represented By
James Kratzenberg
contact info
Plaintiff
Susan L Rhiel
PO Box 307337
Columbus, OH 43026
Represented By
Rick L. Ashton
Allen Stovall Neuman Fisher & Ashton LLP
contact info
Richard K Stovall
Allen Stovall Neuman Fisher & Ashton LLP
contact info
James A Coutinho
Allen Stovall Neuman Fisher & Ashton LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:10 PM EDT
Friday, October 04, 2024
court Receipt of Filing Fee - ADI Fri 10/04 6:30 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by AO. Receipt Number 20000396. (ad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
utility Disposition of Adversary Tue 09/05 10:47 AM
Disposition of Adversary 2:19-ap-2051 (dap)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 09/05 10:48 AM
Adversary Case 2:19-ap-2051 Closed (dap)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 21, 2023
13 13 notice Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Mon 08/21 2:30 PM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Shafirstein, Tom)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 19, 2023
court Hearing Canceled Wed 04/19 8:52 AM
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 25, 2023
12 12 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC Sun 03/26 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 03/25/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)11 Scheduling Order
Thursday, March 23, 2023
11 11 order Scheduling Order Thu 03/23 12:12 PM
General Pretrial Order and Notice of Pretrial Conference. Pretrial set for 4/18/2023 at 10:00 AM Judge Hoffman Courtroom A for1 , Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 4/13/2023. Related [+]. (dap)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel
Wednesday, October 05, 2022
10 10 notice Notice to Take Deposition Wed 10/05 11:27 AM
Notice to Take Deposition of Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Shafirstein, Tom)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2019
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 07/16 2:43 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by James Kratzenberg. (Bentley, Richard)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 07/16 9:43 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of Co-Counsel for Plaintiff by Tom Shafirstein Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Shafirstein, Tom)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2019
7 7 misc Brief Tue 07/02 9:15 PM
Brief Amicus Curiae Filed by Interested Party Angela Dodd United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Dodd, Angela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: Complaint SEC v. Hadsell
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Thursday, May 30, 2019
6 6 misc Stipulation Thu 05/30 11:34 AM
Stipulation with Susan L. Rhiel, Chapter 7 Trustee and James Kratzenberg as to Extension of Time to Respond Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Stovall, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2019
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 05/02 4:36 PM
Summons Service Executed on James Kratzenberg 5/2/2019 (Stovall, Richard)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Summons Issued Thu 05/02 4:36 PM
Summons Issued on James Kratzenberg Date Issued 5/2/2019, Answer Due 06/3/2019 (Stovall, Richard)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 27, 2019
3 3 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Sat 04/27 7:02 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of Co-Counsel for Plaintiff by Rick L. Ashton Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Ashton, Rick)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Sat 04/27 6:54 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of Co-Counsel for Plaintiff by James A Coutinho Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Coutinho, James)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Sat 04/27 5:26 PM
Adversary case 2:19-ap-02051. (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Susan L Rhiel against James Kratzenberg. Receipt Number DEFER, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred (Stovall, Richard)
Related: [-]