Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-52717

Ohio Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John E Hoffman Jr
Case #: 2:19-ap-02052
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 27, 2019
Terminated:Apr 05, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Jonathan Eaton
7518 Canterbury Rd.
Portsmouth, OH 45662
Represented By
Jonathan Eaton
contact info
Defendant
Christine Eaton
7518 Canterbury Rd.
Portsmouth, OH 45662
Represented By
Christine Eaton
contact info
Plaintiff
Susan L Rhiel
PO Box 307337
Columbus, OH 43026
Represented By
James A Coutinho
Allen Stovall Neuman Fisher & Ashton LLP
contact info
Rick L. Ashton
Allen Stovall Neuman Fisher & Ashton LLP
contact info
Richard K Stovall
Allen Stovall Neuman Fisher & Ashton LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:10 PM EDT
Friday, October 04, 2024
court Receipt of Filing Fee - ADI Fri 10/04 6:30 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by AO. Receipt Number 20000396. (ad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 05, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Tue 04/05 3:08 PM
Adversary Case 2:19-ap-2052 Closed (2km)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 18, 2022
14 14 notice Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Fri 03/18 12:41 PM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding With Prejudice Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Shafirstein, Tom)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 03, 2021
13 13 notice Notice of Dismissal (AP) Fri 09/03 8:30 AM
Notice of Dismissal (AP) Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Shafirstein, Tom)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2019
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 10/02 4:33 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Christine Eaton, Jonathan Eaton. (Pickens, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2019
11 11 misc Stipulation Thu 08/29 12:39 PM
Stipulation with Trustee and Defendants as to Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Filed by Defendants Christine Eaton, Jonathan Eaton. (Pickens, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2019
10 10 misc Stipulation Wed 07/31 12:49 PM
Stipulation with Susan L Rhiel, Trustee and Jonathan Eaton and Christine Eaton as to Extension of Time to Respond Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Coutinho, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2019
9 9 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 07/16 9:29 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of Co-Counsel for Plaintiff by Tom Shafirstein Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Shafirstein, Tom)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2019
8 8 misc Brief Tue 07/02 8:10 PM
Brief Amicus Curiae Filed by Interested Party Angela Dodd United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Dodd, Angela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: Complaint SEC v. Hadsell
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Thursday, June 06, 2019
7 7 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 06/06 3:46 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Joseph C Pickens Filed by Defendants Christine Eaton, Jonathan Eaton. (Pickens, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2019
6 6 misc Stipulation Wed 06/05 7:58 AM
Stipulation with Susan L. Rhield, Chapter 7 Trustee, Jonathan and Christine Eaton as to Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Stovall, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2019
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 05/02 4:39 PM
Summons Service Executed on Christine Eaton 5/2/2019; Jonathan Eaton 5/2/2019 (Stovall, Richard)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Summons Issued Thu 05/02 4:39 PM
Summons Issued on Christine Eaton Date Issued 5/2/2019, Answer Due 06/3/2019; Jonathan Eaton Date Issued 5/2/2019, Answer Due 06/3/2019 (Stovall, Richard)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 27, 2019
3 3 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Sat 04/27 7:04 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of Co-Counsel for Plaintiff by Rick L. Ashton Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Ashton, Rick)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Sat 04/27 6:56 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of Co-Counsel for Plaintiff by James A Coutinho Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Coutinho, James)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Sat 04/27 6:10 PM
Adversary case 2:19-ap-02052. (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Susan L Rhiel against Jonathan Eaton, Christine Eaton. Receipt Number DEFER, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred (Stovall, Richard)
Related: [-]