Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-52717

Ohio Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John E Hoffman Jr
Case #: 2:19-ap-02056
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 27, 2019
Terminated:Jan 07, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Thomas Downie
Represented By
Thomas Downie
contact info
Plaintiff
Susan L Rhiel
PO Box 307337
Columbus, OH 43026
Represented By
James A Coutinho
Allen Stovall Neuman Fisher & Ashton LLP
contact info
Rick L. Ashton
Allen Stovall Neuman Fisher & Ashton LLP
contact info
Richard K Stovall
Allen Stovall Neuman Fisher & Ashton LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:10 PM EDT
Friday, October 04, 2024
court Receipt of Filing Fee - ADI Fri 10/04 6:30 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by AO. Receipt Number 20000396. (ad)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 07, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Thu 01/07 9:04 AM
Adversary Case 2:19-ap-2056 Closed (2km)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 22, 2020
6 6 notice Notice of Dismissal (AP) Tue 12/22 12:15 PM
Notice of Dismissal (AP) Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Coutinho, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2019
5 5 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 07/16 9:08 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of Co-Counsel for Plaintiff by Tom Shafirstein Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Shafirstein, Tom)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2019
4 4 misc Brief Tue 07/02 8:05 PM
Brief Amicus Curiae Filed by Interested Party Angela Dodd United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Dodd, Angela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: Complaint SEC v. Hadsell
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Saturday, April 27, 2019
3 3 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Sat 04/27 8:06 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of Co-Counsel for Plaintiff by Rick L. Ashton Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Ashton, Rick)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Sat 04/27 8:02 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of Co-Counsel for Plaintiff by James A Coutinho Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Coutinho, James)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Sat 04/27 7:44 PM
Adversary case 2:19-ap-02056. (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Susan L Rhiel against Thomas Downie. Receipt Number DEFER, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred (Stovall, Richard)
Related: [-]