Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-52717

Ohio Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John E Hoffman Jr
Case #: 2:19-ap-02057
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 27, 2019
Terminated:Oct 12, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
K.C. Hardin
123 Greenhouse Rd
South Shore, KY 41175
Represented By
K.C. Hardin
contact info
Defendant
Pauline Hardin
123 Greenhouse Rd
South Shore, KY 41175
Represented By
Pauline Hardin
contact info
Plaintiff
Susan L Rhiel
PO Box 307337
Columbus, OH 43026
Represented By
Richard K Stovall
Allen Stovall Neuman Fisher & Ashton LLP
contact info
Rick L. Ashton
Allen Stovall Neuman Fisher & Ashton LLP
contact info
James A Coutinho
Allen Stovall Neuman Fisher & Ashton LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:10 PM EDT
Friday, October 04, 2024
court Receipt of Filing Fee - ADI Fri 10/04 6:30 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by AO. Receipt Number 20000396. (ad)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
utility Disposition of Adversary Thu 10/12 12:40 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:19-ap-2057 (dap)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Thu 10/12 12:43 PM
Adversary Case 2:19-ap-2057 Closed (dap)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
18 18 notice Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Mon 09/11 2:52 PM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Shafirstein, Tom)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 19, 2023
court Hearing Canceled Wed 04/19 9:35 AM
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 25, 2023
17 17 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC Sun 03/26 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 03/25/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)16 Scheduling Order
Thursday, March 23, 2023
16 16 order Scheduling Order Thu 03/23 11:33 AM
General Pretrial Order and Notice of Pretrial Conference. Pretrial set for 4/18/2023 at 01:30 PM Judge Hoffman Courtroom A for1 , Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 4/13/2023. Related [+]. (dap)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel
Friday, November 11, 2022
15 15 notice Notice to Take Deposition Fri 11/11 3:39 PM
Notice to Take Deposition of Pauline Hardin Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Shafirstein, Tom)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 22, 2021
14 14 misc Document Fri 10/22 4:33 PM
Document Certificate of Service - KC Hardin's Answers to Trustee's First Set of Interrogatories, Request for Admission, and Request for Production of Documents Filed by Defendant K.C. Hardin. (Ward, Matthew)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Document Fri 10/22 4:26 PM
Document Certificate of Service - Pauline Hardin's Answers to Trustee's First Set of Interrogatories, Request for Admission, and Request for Production of Documents Filed by Defendant Pauline Hardin. (Ward, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2019
12 12 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 07/16 9:32 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of Co-Counsel for Plaintiff by Tom Shafirstein Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Shafirstein, Tom)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2019
11 11 misc Brief Tue 07/02 8:24 PM
Brief Amicus Curiae Filed by Interested Party Angela Dodd United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Dodd, Angela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Complaint SEC v. Hadsell
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Thursday, June 06, 2019
10 10 BNC Certificate of Mailing - BNC Fri 06/07 12:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 06/06/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)7 Regarding Deficient Filing
9 9 misc Substitute PDF Thu 06/06 10:23 AM
Substitute PDF Filed by Defendants K.C. Hardin, Pauline Hardin Related [+]. (Ward, Matthew)
Related: [-] 6 Answer to Complaint
Tuesday, June 04, 2019
8 8 misc Substitute PDF Tue 06/04 2:27 PM
Substitute PDF Filed by Defendants K.C. Hardin, Pauline Hardin Related [+]. (Ward, Matthew)
Related: [-] 6 Answer to Complaint,7 Regarding Deficient Filing
7 7 order Regarding Deficient Filing Tue 06/04 9:16 AM
Notice of Deficient Filing and Order Setting Deadline for Compliance Regarding: Related [+]. Substitution of PDF Due: 6/18/2019. (2dp)
Related: [-] 6 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant K.C. Hardin, Defendant Pauline Hardin
Monday, June 03, 2019
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 06/03 4:16 PM
Answer to Complaint (Hardins' Answer to Complaint) Filed by K.C. Hardin, Pauline Hardin. (Ward, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2019
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 05/02 4:54 PM
Summons Service Executed on K.C. Hardin 5/2/2019; Pauline Hardin 5/2/2019 (Stovall, Richard)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Summons Issued Thu 05/02 4:53 PM
Summons Issued on K.C. Hardin Date Issued 5/2/2019, Answer Due 06/3/2019; Pauline Hardin Date Issued 5/2/2019, Answer Due 06/3/2019 (Stovall, Richard)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 27, 2019
3 3 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Sat 04/27 8:07 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of Co-Counsel for Plaintiff by Rick L. Ashton Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Ashton, Rick)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Sat 04/27 8:03 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of Co-Counsel for Plaintiff by James A Coutinho Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Coutinho, James)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Sat 04/27 7:49 PM
Adversary case 2:19-ap-02057. (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Susan L Rhiel against K.C. Hardin, Pauline Hardin. Receipt Number DEFER, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred (Stovall, Richard)
Related: [-]