Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-52717

Ohio Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:John E Hoffman Jr
Case #: 2:19-ap-02062
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 27, 2019
Terminated:Apr 15, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Robert Walton, Jr.
125 Southbend Ct.
Loveland, OH 45140
Represented By
Robert Walton, Jr.
contact info
Plaintiff
Susan L Rhiel
PO Box 307337
Columbus, OH 43026
Represented By
James A Coutinho
Allen Stovall Neuman Fisher & Ashton LLP
contact info
Richard K Stovall
Allen Stovall Neuman Fisher & Ashton LLP
contact info
Rick L. Ashton
Allen Stovall Neuman Fisher & Ashton LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:10 PM EDT
Friday, October 04, 2024
court Receipt of Filing Fee - ADI Fri 10/04 6:30 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by AO. Receipt Number 20000396. (ad)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 15, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Fri 04/15 7:51 AM
Adversary Case 2:19-ap-2062 Closed (2km)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 02, 2022
12 12 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC Sun 04/03 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 04/02/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)11 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Thursday, March 31, 2022
11 11 order Default Judgment Thu 03/31 2:56 PM
Judgment Entry Granting Motion for Default Judgment Related [+] (2km)
Related: [-] 9
Wednesday, February 17, 2021
10 10 answer Response Wed 02/17 11:03 AM
Response to Related [+] Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel (Coutinho, James)
Related: [-] 7 Order of Proposed Dismissal
9 9 motion Default Judgment Wed 02/17 11:00 AM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel (Coutinho, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 29, 2021
8 8 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC Sat 01/30 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 01/29/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)7 Order of Proposed Dismissal
Wednesday, January 27, 2021
7 7 order Proposed Dismissal Wed 01/27 3:45 PM
Order Proposing Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding. Objections Due: 2/17/2021. (2km)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2019
6 6 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 07/16 2:06 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of Co-Counsel for Plaintiff by Tom Shafirstein Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Shafirstein, Tom)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2019
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 05/02 5:13 PM
Summons Service Executed on Robert Walton Jr. 5/2/2019 (Stovall, Richard)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Summons Issued Thu 05/02 5:12 PM
Summons Issued on Robert Walton Jr. Date Issued 5/2/2019, Answer Due 06/3/2019 (Stovall, Richard)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2019
3 3 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 04/29 10:28 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Rick L. Ashton Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Ashton, Rick)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 04/29 10:22 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by James A Coutinho Filed by Plaintiff Susan L Rhiel. (Coutinho, James)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 27, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Sat 04/27 11:27 PM
Adversary case 2:19-ap-02062. (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Susan L Rhiel against Robert Walton Jr.. Receipt Number DEFER, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred (Stovall, Richard)
Related: [-]