Hospital Acquisition Intermediate Sub, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:19-bk-10998
Lead case is: 1:19-bk-10998
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Brendan Linehan Shannon |
Case #: | 1:19-bk-10999 |
Case Filed: | May 06, 2019 |
Terminated: | Mar 29, 2021 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 25,001-50,000 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Health Care Business |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Hospital Acquisition Intermediate Sub, LLC
5340 Legacy Dr Ste 150
Plano, TX 75024-3131 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Docket last updated: 43 minutes ago |
Monday, March 29, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Final Decree Closing Certain Cases and Amending Caption of Remaining Case Signed on 3/26/2021 (LCN) |
|
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Mon 03/29 8:57 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (LCN) |
||
Tuesday, July 02, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs, Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Hospital Acquisition Intermediate Sub, LLC. (Luton Chapman, Jaime) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, May 09, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
none
Thu 05/09 8:31 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 19-10999 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 9299873, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Wednesday, May 08, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Order Directing the Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases. An order has been entered in this case directing the joint administration for procedural purposes only of the chapter 11 cases of Hospital Acquisition LLC, Hospital Acquisition Intermediate Sub LLC, LifeCare Holdings LLC (f/k/a Hospital Acquisition Sub I LLC), LifeCare Behavioral Health Hospital of Pittsburgh LLC, New LifeCare Hospitals LLC, New LifeCare Hospitals of Dayton LLC, New LifeCare Hospitals of Milwaukee LLC, New LifeCare Hospitals of South Texas LLC, Hospital Acquisition Sub II LLC, New LifeCare Management Services LLC, New LifeCare REIT 1 LLC, New LifeCare Hospitals of Mechanicsburg LLC, New Pittsburgh Specialty Hospital LLC, LifeCare Vascular Services, LLC, New LifeCare Hospitals of North Texas LLC, New LifeCare Hospitals of Chester County LLC, New LifeCare Hospitals of Northern Nevada LLC, New Can Antonio Specialty Hospital LLC, New LifeCare Hospitals of North Carolina LLC, New LifeCare Hospitals of Pittsburgh LLC, New NextCare Specialty Hospital of Denver LLC, Hospital Acquisition MI LLC, Life Care Pharmacy Services LLC, New LifeCare REIT 2 LLC, New LifeCare Hospitals at Tenaya LLC and New LifeCare Hospitals of Sarasota LLC. The docket in the chapter 11 case of Hospital Acquisition LLC, Case No. 19-10998 (BLS), should be consulted for all matters concerning this case. Signed on 5/8/2019 (LCN) |
|
Tuesday, May 07, 2019 | ||
court
Case Assigned
Tue 05/07 7:57 AM
Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon added to case (LB) |
||
Monday, May 06, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Hospital Acquisition Intermediate Sub, LLC. Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 06/5/2019 (Cleary, M. Blake) |