SB360 Capital Partners, LLC v. Giuliano et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11736
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-11736
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Kevin Gross |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-50197 |
Nature of Suit | 91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | May 08, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jul 12, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Alfred T. Giuliano, as Chapter 7 Trustee of Heritage Home Group, LLC
Giuliano Miller & Co., LLC Berlin Business Park 140 Bradford Drive
West Berlin, NJ 08091 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
PNC Bank, National Association, as Agent
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SB360 Capital Partners, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 1:05 PM EDT |
Friday, July 12, 2019 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 07/12 12:39 PM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-50197 Closed (SH) |
||
Thursday, June 27, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice related document(s)1 Filed by SB360 Capital Partners, LLC. (Phillips, Marc) |
|
Wednesday, May 15, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Answer to Complaint Filed by PNC Bank, National Association(Tarr, Stanley) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, May 08, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendants Alfred T. Giuliano, as Chapter 7 Trustee of Heritage Home Group, LLC, PNC Bank, National Association, in its capacity as Agent. Tickle due by: 7/8/2019. (Phillips, Marc) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Wed 05/08 6:48 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 19-50197 KG) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9299726, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 19-50197 Complaint to Recover Moneys Due Plaintiff Pursuant to Bankruptcy Court Order That Were Taken From Debtors by Defendant During Pendency of Chapter 11 Action by SB360 Capital Partners, LLC against Alfred T. Giuliano, as Chapter 7 Trustee of Heritage Home Group, LLC, PNC Bank, National Association, in its capacity as Agent. Fee Amount $350 (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(91 (Declaratory judgment)). AP Summons Served due date: 08/6/2019. (Phillips, Marc) |