Heritage Home Group LLC
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Brendan Linehan Shannon |
Case #: | 1:18-bk-11736 |
Case Filed: | Jul 29, 2018 |
Creditor Meeting: | May 22, 2019 |
Claims Deadline: | May 24, 2019 |
Converted: | Mar 15, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jul 16, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 25,001-50,000 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Heritage Home Group LLC
1925 Eastchester Drive
High Point, NC 27265 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Friday Jan 18, 2019 12:36 PM EST |
Attorney
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
|
|
Claims Agent
Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC
www.kccllc.com 2335 Alaska Ave
El Segundo, CA 90245 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
BMC Group VDR LLC
3732 W. 120th Street
Hawthorne, CA 90250 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
St. Michael Investments
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Swann Investments, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Oracle America, Inc.
Margolis Edelstein 300 Delaware Avenue Suite 800
WILMINGTON, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Tarrant County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts
Courtney J. Hull c/o Sherri K. Simpson, Paralegal P.O. Box 12548
Austin, TX 78711 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Thomasville-Dexel, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Minnesota Department of Revenue Taxes
600 N. Robert Stret
St. Paul, MN 55101 |
|
Creditor
Westchester Fire Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Yash Technologies Pvt. Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Acadia Realty Limited Partnership
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Regency Centers, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Campbell & Co.
90 Merrick Avenue
East Meadow, NY 11554 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Deer Creek Lot 4 07 A, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Department of Labor and Industry, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania
Collections and Support Unit 651 Boas Street Room 702
Harrisburg, PA 17121 |
|
Creditor
Department of the Treasury
Internal Revenue Service 550 Main Street, Room 3525
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
|
Creditor
Miller Hill Lenoir, LLC
Horack Talley Pharr & Lowndes 301 S. College Street Suite 2600
Charlotte, NC 28202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Fabricut, Inc
9303 East 46th Street
Tulsa, OK 74145 |
|
Creditor
United Furniture Industries, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
JPMCC 2007-CIBC19 Bethlehem Pike, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
International Business Machines Corporation
|
|
Creditor
Innovative Delivery Systems, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Hickory Furniture Mart, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
International Market Centers, LP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
SAP America, Inc.
Brown & Connery, LLP Donald K. Ludman, Esquire 6 N. Broad Street Suite 100
Woodbury, NJ 08096 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Big Twig Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a Timber Wolf Forest Products
LeClairRyan 800 North King Street, Suite 303
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
TN Dept of Revenue
Bankruptcy Division P.O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Dallas County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson,LLP c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Diversitex, Inc.
LeClairRyan 800 North King Street, Suite 303
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
EEB KIRK, LLC
Stone, Leyton & Gershman 7733 Forsyth Blvd. Suite 500
Saint Louis, MO 63105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Federal Realty Investment Trust
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Grapevine-Colleyville ISD
500 E Border Street Suite 640
Arlington, TX 76010 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Harris County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP C/O John P. Dillman P.O. Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Palmetto Electric Cooperative Inc
4063 Grays Highway
Ridgeland, SC 29936 |
|
Creditor
Hickory Springs Manufacturing Company, HS Manufacturing, LLC and HS Foam Fabricators, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Simon Property Group, L.P.
225 West Washington Street
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
KIR Maple Grove, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
KPS Capital Partners, L.P., KPS Special Situations Fund III (A), L.P., KPS Special Situations Fund III (Supplemental), LP, KPS Special Situations Fund III (AIV), LP, and KPS Special Situations Fund II
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Lightning Transportation, Inc.
16820 C Blake Road
Hagerstown, MD 21740 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Missouri Department of Revenue
Bankruptcy Unit PO Box 475
Jefferson City, MO 65105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
PNC Bank, National Association, in its capacity as administrative agent and collateral agent
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
PS Court Associates, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Piedmont Packaging, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
RPAI Oak Brook Promenade I, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS
|
Represented By
|
Financial Advisor
Houlihan Lokey Capital, Inc.
|
|
Interested Party
Supreme People's Procuracy of the Socialist Republic of Viet Nam
|
|
Interested Party
Hanes Industries
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Stork Craft (Asia) SRL
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
SB360 Capital Partners, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
CPT Creekside Town Center, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Hickory Chair LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
PPL Acquisition Group I, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Synchrony Bank
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Wayne Industries, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
FBI Wind Down, Inc. Liquidating Trust, by and through Alan D. Halperin, as Liquidating Trustee
40 Wall Street, 37th Floor
New York, NY 10005 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Leggett & Platt, Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
L&P Financial Services Co.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
HHG IPCo., LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
HHP Raleigh LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
International Market Centers, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Hanes Companies, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Hanes Converting Company
|
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
AP Services, LLC
|
|
Spec. Counsel
Joseph A. Malfitano, PLLC
|
|
Transcriber
Reliable
1007 North Orange St
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Trustee
Alfred T. Giuliano
Giuliano Miller & Co., LLC Berlin Business Park 140 Bradford Drive
West Berlin, NJ 08091 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
1. | Heritage Home Group sells furniture brands, files Chapter 11 (woodworkingnetwork.com) |
Submitted Mon 07/30/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 05/07/2021 6:07 AM EDT |