Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-42726

Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kathleen H Sanberg
Case #: 4:19-ap-04130
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:May 09, 2019
Terminated:Oct 28, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
STEELSERIES NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION
656 West Randolph Street Suite 2E
Chicago, IL 60661
Plaintiff
Nauni Manty, as chapter 7 trustee of the bankruptcy estates of the above-named Debtors
Manty & Associates PA 401 Second Ave N Suite 400
Minneapolis, MN 55401
Represented By
Jacqueline J. Williams
Manty & Associates PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Monday, October 28, 2019
court MNB Close adversary case Mon 10/28 10:47 AM
Adversary case 4:19-ap-4130 closed (Kathy MNBM)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2019
utility MNB Disposition of adversary Fri 10/25 11:03 AM
Disposition of adversary 4:19-ap-4130. Disposition: dismissed with prejudice. (Lynn MNBM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2019
13 13 notice MNB Notice of dismissal Thu 10/24 4:06 PM
Notice of dismissal filed by Nauni Manty Proof of service.. (Williams, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 10, 2019
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 08/10 11:33 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 08/10/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2019
11 11 order MNB Order (Generic) Thu 08/08 10:34 AM
Order Re: Related [+]. Notice of Entry affixed. (Lynn MNBM)
Related: [-] 10 Second stipulation to extend time to respond to the complaint
Wednesday, August 07, 2019
10 10 misc MNB Stipulation or agreement Wed 08/07 3:35 PM
Stipulation filed by Nauni Manty and Defendant STEELSERIES NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION. Proposed order. Nature of stipulation: extension of time to respond to complaint(Williams, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2019
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 06/13 11:50 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 06/13/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2019
8 8 order MNB Order (Generic) Tue 06/11 2:24 PM
Order Re: Related [+]. Notice of Entry affixed. (Lynn MNBM)
Related: [-] 7 Stipulation to extend time to respond to the complaint
7 7 misc MNB Stipulation or agreement Tue 06/11 10:40 AM
Stipulation filed by Nauni Manty and Shima S. Roy. Proposed order. Nature of stipulation: extend time to respond to the complaint(Williams, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2019
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 05/15 11:54 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 05/15/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc MNB Certificate of service Wed 05/15 9:09 AM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by Nauni Manty.(Williams, Jacqueline)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,3 Summons for adversary proceeding
Monday, May 13, 2019
4 4 court MNB Receipt of filing fee (OTC auto) Mon 05/13 4:01 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by KH. Receipt Number 207781. (admin)
Related: [-]
3 3 court MNB Summons for adversary proceeding Mon 05/13 1:40 PM
Summons issued on STEELSERIES NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION Date Issued 5/13/2019, Answer Due 6/12/2019 (Lynn MNBM)
Related: [-]
2 2 court MNB Clerk notice of fees due Mon 05/13 10:47 AM
Clerk's notice of fees due. Amount due: 350.00. (Lynn MNBM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2019
1 1 cmp MNB Complaint (fee) Thu 05/09 2:13 PM
Adversary case 19-04130 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), Complaint without demand for jury trial by Nauni J Manty against STEELSERIES NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $350 (Williams, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]