Member Case
Lead case is: 1:19-bk-11047

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin Gross
Case #: 1:19-bk-11055
Case Filed:May 10, 2019
Terminated:Jan 02, 2020

Debtor
Cloud Peak Energy Finance Corp.
385 Interlocken Cres Ste 400
Broomfield, CO 80021-3561
Represented By
Daniel J. DeFranceschi
Richards, Layton & Finger
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 48 minutes ago
Thursday, January 02, 2020
7 7 9 pgs order Order Thu 01/02 3:31 PM
Order (I) Authorizing the Closure of Certain Chapter 11 Cases; and (II) Granting Related Relief. Signed on 1/2/2020 (SJS)
Related: [-]
court Close Bankruptcy Case Mon 01/06 10:11 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (GM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2019
6 6 misc Schedules/Statements Tue 06/25 12:20 AM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Cloud Peak Energy Finance Corp.. (Queroli, David)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Schedules/Statements Tue 06/25 12:19 AM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by Cloud Peak Energy Finance Corp.. (Queroli, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2019
4 4 order Order-Joint Admin Tue 05/14 3:52 PM
Order (I) Directing Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases and (II) Waiving the Requirements of Bankruptcy Code Section 342(c)(1) and Bankruptcy Rules 1005 and 2002(n). An order has been entered in this case in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the Local Bankruptcy Rules of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware directing joint administration for procedural purposes only of the chapter 11 cases of Cloud Peak Energy Inc., Case No. 19-11047 Antelope Coal LLC, Case No. 19-11049 Arrowhead I LLC, Case No. 19-11050 Arrowhead II LLC, Case No. 19-11051 Arrowhead III LLC, Case No. 19-11069 Big Metal Coal Co. LLC, Case No. 19-11053 Caballo Rojo LLC, Case No. 19-11076 Caballo Rojo Holdings LLC, Case No. 19-11071 Cloud Peak Energy Finance Corp., Case No. 19-11055 Cloud Peak Energy Logistics LLC, Case No. 19-11061 Cloud Peak Energy Logistics I LLC, Case No. 19-11073 Cloud Peak Energy Resources LLC, Case No. 19-11057 Cloud Peak Energy Services Company, Case No. 19-11063 Cordero Mining LLC, Case No. 19-11052 Cordero Mining Holdings LLC, Case No. 19-11075 Cordero Oil and Gas LLC, Case No. 19-11058 Kennecott Coal Sales LLC, Case No. 19-11060 NERCO LLC, Case No. 19-11054 NERCO Coal LLC, Case No. 19-11064 NERCO Coal Sales LLC, Case No. 19-11068 Prospect Land and Development LLC, Case No. 19-11065 Resource Development LLC, Case No. 19-11070 Sequatchie Valley Coal Corporation, Case No. 19-11072 Spring Creek Coal LLC, Case No. 19-11066 Western Minerals LLC, Case No. 19-11062 Youngs Creek Holdings I LLC, Case No. 19-11059 Youngs Creek Holdings II LLC, Case No. 19-11074 Youngs Creek Mining Company, LLC, Case No. 19-11056 The docket in Case No. 19-11047 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Signed on 5/14/2019 (RC)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2019
3 3 motion Joint Administration - Motion (Multi) Fri 05/10 5:53 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Cloud Peak Energy Inc.. (DeFranceschi, Daniel)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd none Fri 05/10 4:47 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 19-11055 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 9302457, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 23 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fri 05/10 3:23 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Cloud Peak Energy Finance Corp.. (DeFranceschi, Daniel)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Fri 05/10 4:50 PM
Judge Kevin Gross added to case (SH)
Related: [-]