Caballo Rojo LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:19-bk-11047
Lead case is: 1:19-bk-11047
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Kevin Gross |
Case #: | 1:19-bk-11076 |
Case Filed: | May 10, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jan 02, 2020 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1,000-5,000 |
Est. Assets | $500,000,001 to $1 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $500,000,001 to $1 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Caballo Rojo LLC
385 Interlocken Cres Ste 400
Broomfield, CO 80021-3561 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Docket last updated: 41 minutes ago |
Thursday, January 02, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Order (I) Authorizing the Closure of Certain Chapter 11 Cases; and (II) Granting Related Relief. Signed on 1/2/2020 (SJS) |
|
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Mon 01/06 10:35 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (GM) |
||
Tuesday, June 25, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Caballo Rojo LLC. (Queroli, David) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by Caballo Rojo LLC. (Queroli, David) |
|
Tuesday, May 14, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Order (I) Directing Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases and (II) Waiving the Requirements of Bankruptcy Code Section 342(c)(1) and Bankruptcy Rules 1005 and 2002(n). An order has been entered in this case in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the Local Bankruptcy Rules of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware directing joint administration for procedural purposes only of the chapter 11 cases of Cloud Peak Energy Inc., Case No. 19-11047 Antelope Coal LLC, Case No. 19-11049 Arrowhead I LLC, Case No. 19-11050 Arrowhead II LLC, Case No. 19-11051 Arrowhead III LLC, Case No. 19-11069 Big Metal Coal Co. LLC, Case No. 19-11053 Caballo Rojo LLC, Case No. 19-11076 Caballo Rojo Holdings LLC, Case No. 19-11071 Cloud Peak Energy Finance Corp., Case No. 19-11055 Cloud Peak Energy Logistics LLC, Case No. 19-11061 Cloud Peak Energy Logistics I LLC, Case No. 19-11073 Cloud Peak Energy Resources LLC, Case No. 19-11057 Cloud Peak Energy Services Company, Case No. 19-11063 Cordero Mining LLC, Case No. 19-11052 Cordero Mining Holdings LLC, Case No. 19-11075 Cordero Oil and Gas LLC, Case No. 19-11058 Kennecott Coal Sales LLC, Case No. 19-11060 NERCO LLC, Case No. 19-11054 NERCO Coal LLC, Case No. 19-11064 NERCO Coal Sales LLC, Case No. 19-11068 Prospect Land and Development LLC, Case No. 19-11065 Resource Development LLC, Case No. 19-11070 Sequatchie Valley Coal Corporation, Case No. 19-11072 Spring Creek Coal LLC, Case No. 19-11066 Western Minerals LLC, Case No. 19-11062 Youngs Creek Holdings I LLC, Case No. 19-11059 Youngs Creek Holdings II LLC, Case No. 19-11074 Youngs Creek Mining Company, LLC, Case No. 19-11056 The docket in Case No. 19-11047 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Signed on 5/14/2019 (RC) |
|
Monday, May 13, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
none
Mon 05/13 10:09 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 19-11076 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 9303282, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Friday, May 10, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Cloud Peak Energy Inc.. (DeFranceschi, Daniel) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Caballo Rojo LLC. (DeFranceschi, Daniel) |
|
court
Case Assigned
Fri 05/10 4:50 PM
Judge Kevin Gross added to case (SH) |