Illinois Central District Court
Judge:Michael M Mihm
Referred: Jonathan E Hawley
Case #: 1:19-cv-01162
Nature of Suit240 Real Property - Torts to Land
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:May 13, 2019
Terminated:Apr 08, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Nov 09, 2019 2:46 AM CST
Counter Claimant
Joseph A. Scharf
Represented By
Richard T Marvel
Marvel Law Office
contact info
Counter Defendant
William Brokaw Price
Represented By
Robert B McCoy
Miller Hall & Triggs
contact info
Mark D Walton
Miller Hall & Triggs
contact info
Defendant
Carri Scharf Trucking, Inc.
Represented By
Richard T Marvel
Marvel Law Office
contact info
Defendant
Joseph A. Scharf
Represented By
Richard T Marvel
Marvel Law Office
contact info
Plaintiff
William Brokaw Price
Represented By
Robert B McCoy
Miller Hall & Triggs
contact info
Mark D Walton
Miller Hall & Triggs
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
order Order on Motion to Strike Tue 12/03 9:58 AM
TEXT ORDER Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 12/3/2024. Granting Plaintiff's456 Motion to Strike. The Clerk is DIRECTED to strike Plaintiff's455 Appellate Brief. (AEJ)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
456 456 motion Strike Mon 12/02 4:49 PM
MOTION to Strike455 Appellant's Brief by Plaintiffs William Brokaw Price, Sharon Price, Windfall Properties, LLC. Responses due by 12/16/2024 (Walton, Mark)
Related: [-]
455 455 appeal Appellants Brief Mon 12/02 4:31 PM
Appellant's BRIEF by William Brokaw Price, Sharon Price, Windfall Properties, LLC. Appellee Brief due by 1/2/2025.(Walton, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix,
Att: 2 Appendix Joint