Original Case: 1:19-cv-01162

Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cv-02716
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit240 Real Property - Torts to Land
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 01, 2024 3:19 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellant
CARRI SCHARF TRUCKING, INC., an Illinois Corporation
Represented By
Richard T. Marvel
MARVEL LAW OFFICE
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
CARRI SCHARF MATERIALS COMPANY, an Illinois Corporation
Represented By
Richard T. Marvel
MARVEL LAW OFFICE
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
JOSEPH A. SCHARF
Represented By
Richard T. Marvel
MARVEL LAW OFFICE
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
WILLIAM B. PRICE
Represented By
Mark D. Walton
MILLER, HALL & TRIGGS
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
SHARON PRICE
Represented By
Mark D. Walton
MILLER, HALL & TRIGGS
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
WINDFALL PROPERTIES, LLC
Represented By
Mark D. Walton
MILLER, HALL & TRIGGS
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/01/2024 3:16 AM CDT
Friday, September 27, 2024
1 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellants Carri Scharf Materials Company, Carri Scharf Trucking, Inc. and Joseph A. Scharf by 10/04/2024. Transcript information sheet due by 10/11/2024. Appellant's brief due on or before 11/06/2024 for Carri Scharf Materials Company, Carri Scharf Trucking, Inc. and Joseph A. Scharf. [1] [7408239] 24-2716 (HTP) [Entered: 09/30/2024 09:15 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 94 pgs Civil Case
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court