Connecticut District Court
Judge:Victor A Bolden
Case #: 3:19-cv-00722
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:May 13, 2019
Last checked: Saturday Nov 09, 2019 3:40 AM EST
Defendant
Andrew Greco
Represented By
Thomas R. Gerarde
Howd & Ludorf
contact info
Defendant
James Heavey
Represented By
Thomas R. Gerarde
Howd & Ludorf
contact info
Defendant
Peter Tesei
Represented By
Thomas R. Gerarde
Howd & Ludorf
contact info
Defendant
Albert Escoffery
Represented By
Thomas R. Gerarde
Howd & Ludorf
contact info
Defendant
Town of Greenwich
Represented By
Valerie Maze Keeney
Town Of Greenwich
contact info
Defendant
Greenwich Police Dept
Represented By
Valerie Maze Keeney
Town Of Greenwich
contact info
Defendant
Sean P. O'Donnell
Represented By
Thomas R. Gerarde
Howd & Ludorf
contact info
Defendant
Danielle Petruso
Represented By
Thomas R. Gerarde
Howd & Ludorf
contact info
Defendant
Hayes Sgaglio
Represented By
Thomas R. Gerarde
Howd & Ludorf
contact info
Defendant
Brian N. Tornga
Represented By
Thomas R. Gerarde
Howd & Ludorf
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Moran
Represented By
Gary N Rawlins
Rawlins Law, PLLC
contact info

GPO Aug 13 2021
ORDER denying 54 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. For the reasons described in the attached ruling and order, Mr. Moran's motion for judgment on the pleadings is DENIED, and his motion to dismiss claims against Mr. O'Donnell in his individual capacity is DENIED as moot in light of his notice of withdrawal. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 08/13/2021. (Dalton, A.)
GPO May 19 2023
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 215 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 216 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 229 Motion to Strike; denying 230 Motion to Consolidate Cases; denying as moot 232 Motion to Strike.For the reasons stated in the attached ruling and order, the Town Defendants' motion for summary judgment is GRANTED.The Individual Defendants' motion for summary judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Individual Defendants' motion for summary judgment is granted as to all claims against Sergeant ODonnell, Officer Tornga, Officer Sgaglio, Officer Escoffery, and Sergeant Petruso. The Individual Defendants' motion for summary judgment is denied as to the excessive force claim (Count Two) and the assault and battery claim (Count Seven) against Officer Greco. The Individual Defendants' motion for summary judgment is granted as to all other claims against Officer Greco. Defendants' motions to strike are DENIED as moot.Mr. Moran's motion to consolidate this case with docket number 3:23-cv-00330 (VAB) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 5/19/2023. (Bartlett, H)
GPO Jun 28 2024
ORDER granting 263 Motion for Reconsideration; granting 269 Motion to Join Objection.For the reasons set forth in the attached Ruling and Order, Mr. Moran's motion for an extension of time to file his motion for reconsideration is GRANTED nunc pro tunc, and his motion for reconsideration is GRANTED. The Court's March 28, 2024, Ruling and Order in Moran v. Greenwich, No. 23-cv-330, ECF No. 34, is VACATED as to Mr. Moran's § 1983 fair trial claim based on fabrication of evidence, and Mr. Moran's motion to amend as to this claim is GRANTED.Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 6/28/2024. (Thompson, M.)
GPO Feb 21 2025
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 282 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying as moot 286 Motion to Dismiss.For the reasons in the attached Ruling and Order, the motion for leave to amend is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part.Leave to amend Count Two is GRANTED.Leave to amend Count One and Count Four is GRANTED for claims against Officer Greco, Officer Podmokly, Sergeant O'Donnell, and Officer Tornga in their individual capacities based on their alleged falsification of police reports and providing false testimony, and DENIED as futile for claims against First Selectman Camillo, Former First Selectman Tesei, and Police Chief Heavey in their individual capacities.Leave to amend Count One, Count Three, and Count Four is DENIED as futile for claims against any Defendant based on withholding certain evidence, failing to properly investigate, or any other basis apart from the creation or offering of fabricated evidence to be used at Mr. Moran's criminal trial.Leave to amend Count Three is GRANTED as to claims against the Town based on the alleged fabrication of evidence during Mr. Moran's trial and DENIED as to all other claims, including claims based on the alleged use of excessive force.The Town Defendants' motion to dismiss is DENIED as moot.Mr. Moran may proceed on Count Two, excessive force and state law assault against Officer Greco, Counts One/Four, fabrication of evidence against the Individual Defendants in their individual capacities, and Count Three, municipal liability based on allegations of fabrication of evidence in the Second Amended Consolidated Complaint.Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 2/21/2025. (Cunningham, A)

Docket last updated: 83 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
353 353 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Tue 05/20 4:17 PM
ORDER granting350 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The Court GRANTS the motion for leave to file excess pages. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 05/20/2025. (Fogel, M.)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 16, 2025
352 352 14 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Fri 05/16 11:50 PM
First Memorandum in Opposition and request for short stay re346 Joint MOTION in Limine to Preclude Expert Testimony of Vincent O'Banner, Howard I Baum, MD and Reginald F. Allard, Jr. ,347 MOTION for Leave to File to Amended Answer & Affirmative Defenses filed by Robert Moran. (Rawlins, Gary)
Related: [-]
351 351 motion Summary Judgment Fri 05/16 3:29 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Andrew Greco, Sean O'Donnell, Hayes Podmokly, Brian Tornga.Responses due by 6/6/2025(Gerarde, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Statement of Material Facts,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Exhibit C,
Att: 6 Exhibit C, Subparts A-G, Notice of Manual Filing,
Att: 7 Exhibit D,
Att: 8 Exhibit E,
Att: 9 Exhibit F,
Att: 10 Exhibit G,
Att: 11 Exhibit H,
Att: 12 Exhibit I,
Att: 13 Exhibit J,
Att: 14 Exhibit K,
Att: 15 Exhibit L,
Att: 16 Exhibit M,
Att: 17 Exhibit N,
Att: 18 Exhibit O,
Att: 19 Exhibit P,
Att: 20 Exhibit Q,
Att: 21 Exhibit R,
Att: 22 Exhibit S
350 350 motion File Excess Pages Fri 05/16 3:00 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Defendants' Motion for Permission to File Local Rule Statement in Excess of Page Limitation by Andrew Greco, Sean O'Donnell, Hayes Podmokly, Brian Tornga. (Gerarde, Thomas)
Related: [-]
349 349 motion Summary Judgment Fri 05/16 1:05 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Town of Greenwich.Responses due by 6/6/2025(Tallberg, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Statement of Material Facts