Original Case: 3:19-cv-00722

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-00901
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jun 15, 2023
Terminated:Apr 12, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 15, 2024 5:52 AM EDT
Defendant
Peter Tesei
Represented By
James N. Tallberg
Karsten & Tallberg, LLC
contact info
Defendant
James Heavey
Represented By
James N. Tallberg
Karsten & Tallberg, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Sean P. O'Donnell
Represented By
Thomas Gerarde
Howd & Ludorf, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Brian N. Tornga
Represented By
Thomas Gerarde
Howd & Ludorf, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Hayes Sgaglio
Represented By
Thomas Gerarde
Howd & Ludorf, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Albert Escoffery
Represented By
Thomas Gerarde
Howd & Ludorf, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Danielle Petruso
Represented By
Thomas Gerarde
Howd & Ludorf, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Town of Greenwich, Connecticut
Represented By
James N. Tallberg
Karsten & Tallberg, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Greenwich Police Dept
Represented By
James N. Tallberg
Karsten & Tallberg, LLC
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Andrew Greco
Represented By
Thomas Gerarde
Howd & Ludorf, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Robert Moran
Represented By
Alexander J. Wulwick
Alexander J. Wulwick, Esq.
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/15/2024 5:50 AM EDT
Thursday, June 15, 2023
1 1 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Andrew Greco, FILED. [3530783] [23-901] [Entered: 06/20/2023 09:22 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax
Att: 2 65 pgs Case FILED
2 2 30+ pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 05/19/2023, RECEIVED.[3530792] [23-901] [Entered: 06/20/2023 09:30 AM]
Related: [-]
4 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Andrew Greco, district court receipt # ACTDC-7383690, FILED.[3530796] [23-901] [Entered: 06/20/2023 09:31 AM]
Related: [-]