Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-42726

Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kathleen H Sanberg
Case #: 4:19-ap-04133
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:May 14, 2019
Terminated:Jul 31, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
ILY Enterprise, Inc. d/b/a Flashforge USA
18545 Gale Avenue
Industry, CA 91748
Plaintiff
Nauni Manty, as chapter 7 Trustee of the Bankruptcy Estates of the above-named Debtors
Manty & Associates PA 401 Second Ave N Suite 400
Minneapolis, MN 55401
Represented By
Mary F. Sieling
Manty & Associates P A
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Friday, August 02, 2019
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 08/02 11:49 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 08/02/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 08/02 11:49 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 08/02/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2019
7 7 order MNB Judgment Wed 07/31 11:05 AM
Judgment for adv 4:19-ap-4133. Notice of Entry affixed. (Lynn MNBM)
Related: [-]
6 6 order MNB Default judgment - motion Wed 07/31 10:53 AM
Order Granting Motion for default judgment Related [+]. Notice of entry affixed. (Lynn MNBM)
Related: [-] 5
court MNB CHAP Minutes re hrg set by motion, aplc or order Wed 07/31 10:45 AM
Minutes re: Related [+] No appearance, granted by default. Order to be entered. (lynn)
Related: [-] 5 Motion for default judgment filed by Nauni Manty
utility MNB Disposition of adversary Wed 07/31 11:06 AM
Disposition of adversary 4:19-ap-4133. Judgment For plaintiff. Disposition: granted. (Lynn MNBM)
Related: [-]
court MNB Close adversary case Wed 07/31 2:01 PM
Adversary case 4:19-ap-4133 closed (Kathy MNBM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2019
court MNB Public entry Wed 07/17 4:30 PM
Clerk's entry of default re defendant ILY Enterprise, Inc., d/b/a Flashforge USA re1 Complaint (Lynn MNBM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2019
5 5 motion MNB Motion for default judgment Wed 07/03 3:52 PM
Motion for default judgment filed by Plaintiff Nauni Manty. Affidavit of default, Affidavit of identification, Affidavit on the merits, Proposed findings of fact, conclusions of law and order for judgment, Certificate of service. Hearing scheduled 7/31/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 8 West, 8th Floor, 300 S 4th St, Minneapolis, Judge Kathleen H. Sanberg. (Sieling, Mary)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2019
4 4 misc MNB Certificate of service Mon 05/20 8:51 AM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by Nauni Manty.(Sieling, Mary)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,3 Summons for adversary proceeding
Friday, May 17, 2019
3 3 court MNB Summons for adversary proceeding Fri 05/17 10:31 AM
Summons issued on ILY Enterprise, Inc. d/b/a Flashforge USA Date Issued 5/17/2019, Answer Due 6/17/2019 (Lynn MNBM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2019
2 2 court MNB Receipt of filing fee (OTC auto) Thu 05/16 5:01 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by KH. Receipt Number 207796. (admin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2019
1 1 cmp MNB Complaint (fee) Tue 05/14 10:43 AM
Adversary case 19-04133 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), Complaint without demand for jury trial by Nauni Jo Manty against ILY Enterprise, Inc. d/b/a Flashforge USA. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $350 (Sieling, Mary)
Related: [-]