Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-11101

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurie Selber Silverstein
Case #: 1:19-ap-50229
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:May 14, 2019
Terminated:Mar 10, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Cass Information Systems, Inc.
13001 Hollenberg Drive
Bridgeton, MO 63044
Represented By
Cass Information Systems, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Emerald Capital Advisors
Represented By
Patrick A. Jackson
Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Tuesday, March 10, 2020
18 18 notice Dismissal - Notice Tue 03/10 10:31 AM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 03/10 1:22 PM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-50229 Closed (NAB)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 06, 2020
17 17 2 pgs order Order Fri 03/06 2:35 PM
Order Approving Stipulation for Extension of Time Related [+] Order Signed on 3/6/2020. (CMB)
Related: [-] 16
Thursday, March 05, 2020
16 16 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Thu 03/05 4:12 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Stipulation for Extension of Time Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors. (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2020
15 15 2 pgs order Order Thu 02/06 11:59 AM
Order Approving Stipulation for Extension of Time Related [+] Order Signed on 2/6/2020. (LJJ)
Related: [-] 14
Wednesday, February 05, 2020
14 14 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Wed 02/05 3:04 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Stipulation for Extension of Time Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors. (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2020
13 13 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 01/30 5:47 PM
Affidavit of Service of Cathy M. Greer, Paralegal at Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors. (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Rescheduled Hearing - Notice Thu 01/30 10:32 AM
Notice of Rescheduled Hearing Notice of Rescheduled Date and Time of Hearing Hearing Originally Scheduled for February 10, 2020 has been rescheduled. Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors. Hearing scheduled for 3/16/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2020
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Tue 01/28 6:34 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors. (Jackson, Patrick)
Related: [-] 1 ,9
Monday, January 27, 2020
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Mon 01/27 8:23 PM
Amended Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors. (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-] 9
Friday, December 06, 2019
9 9 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Fri 12/06 7:05 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Cass Information Systems, Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 2/10/2020 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 2/4/2020. (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Monday, September 09, 2019
8 8 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Mon 09/09 3:45 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors. Hearing scheduled for 9/12/2019 at 12:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2019
7 7 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 08/30 4:30 PM
Affidavit of Service of Cathy M. Greer, Paralegal at Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors. (Jackson, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2019
6 6 5 pgs order Order Thu 08/29 3:02 PM
Order Approving Motion of the Plaintiff for an Order Extending Deadline to Effect Service of Original Process - Order Signed on 8/29/2019 (LJJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2019
5 5 misc Certificate of No Objection(Multi) Wed 08/28 11:13 AM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Order Extending Deadline to Effect Service of Original Process Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors. (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2019
4 4 misc Affidavit of Service Tue 08/27 5:00 PM
Affidavit of Service of Cathy Greer, Paralegal at Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors. (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2019
3 3 motion Extend - Motion Fri 08/09 7:19 PM
Motion to Extend Time Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Order Extending Deadline for Service of Original Process Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors.. (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2019
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 05/14 7:39 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 19-50229 LSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9306874, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Tue 05/14 7:35 PM
Adversary case 19-50229 Complaint Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers of Property Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502(d) by Emerald Capital Advisors, in its capacity as Plan Administrator against Cass Information Systems, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)). AP Summons Served due date: 08/12/2019. (Jackson, Patrick)
Related: [-]