Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-11101

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurie Selber Silverstein
Case #: 1:19-ap-50232
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:May 14, 2019
Terminated:May 08, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Dekalb Molded Plastics
550 W. Main Street
Butler, IN 46721
Represented By
Dekalb Molded Plastics
contact info
Plaintiff
Emerald Capital Advisors
Represented By
Patrick A. Jackson
Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Friday, May 08, 2020
22 22 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 05/08 10:08 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors. (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Fri 05/08 1:12 PM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-50232 Closed (NAB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 06, 2020
21 21 notice Withdrawal of Document - Notice Wed 05/06 3:12 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Notice of Dismissal Related [+] Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-] 20
Tuesday, May 05, 2020
20 20 notice Dismissal - Notice Tue 05/05 1:33 PM
Notice of Dismissal with Prejudice Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 03, 2020
19 19 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/03 1:26 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by Dekalb Molded Plastics Mediation due date: 08/3/2020. (Brown, Charles)
Related: [-] 1
Friday, March 13, 2020
18 18 2 pgs order Order Fri 03/13 3:18 PM
Order Approving Stipulation for Extension of Time Related [+] Order Signed on 3/13/2020. (CMB)
Related: [-] 16
Wednesday, March 11, 2020
17 17 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 03/11 4:39 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors. Hearing scheduled for 3/16/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Wed 03/11 3:44 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Stipulation for Extension of Time Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors. (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Certificate of Counsel (Multi) Wed 03/11 10:47 AM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Scheduling Order in Adversary Proceedings Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors. (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2020
14 14 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 01/30 5:47 PM
Affidavit of Service of Cathy M. Greer, Paralegal at Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors. (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Rescheduled Hearing - Notice Thu 01/30 10:32 AM
Notice of Rescheduled Hearing Notice of Rescheduled Date and Time of Hearing Hearing Originally Scheduled for February 10, 2020 has been rescheduled. Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors. Hearing scheduled for 3/16/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2020
12 12 misc Certificate of Service Tue 01/28 6:26 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors. (Jackson, Patrick)
Related: [-] 1 ,9
Monday, January 27, 2020
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Mon 01/27 8:28 PM
Amended Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors. (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-] 9
Monday, January 06, 2020
10 10 misc Exhibit Mon 01/06 10:27 AM
Exhibit(s) Stipulation for Extension of Time Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors. (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2019
9 9 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Fri 12/06 7:34 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Dekalb Molded Plastics. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 2/10/2020 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 2/4/2020. (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Monday, September 09, 2019
8 8 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Mon 09/09 3:45 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors. Hearing scheduled for 9/12/2019 at 12:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2019
7 7 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 08/30 4:30 PM
Affidavit of Service of Cathy M. Greer, Paralegal at Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors. (Jackson, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2019
6 6 5 pgs order Order Thu 08/29 3:02 PM
Order Approving Motion of the Plaintiff for an Order Extending Deadline to Effect Service of Original Process - Order Signed on 8/29/2019 (LJJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2019
5 5 misc Certificate of No Objection(Multi) Wed 08/28 11:13 AM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Order Extending Deadline to Effect Service of Original Process Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors. (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2019
4 4 misc Affidavit of Service Tue 08/27 5:00 PM
Affidavit of Service of Cathy Greer, Paralegal at Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors. (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2019
3 3 motion Extend - Motion Fri 08/09 7:19 PM
Motion to Extend Time Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Order Extending Deadline for Service of Original Process Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors.. (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2019
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 05/14 10:41 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 19-50232 LSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9306914, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Tue 05/14 10:00 PM
Adversary case 19-50232 Complaint Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers of Property Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502(d) by Emerald Capital Advisors, in its capacity as Plan Administrator against Dekalb Molded Plastics. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)). AP Summons Served due date: 08/12/2019. (Jackson, Patrick)
Related: [-]