Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-11101

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurie Selber Silverstein
Case #: 1:19-ap-50233
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:May 14, 2019
Terminated:Nov 04, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Forge Industrial Staffing, Inc.
1010 W. Coliseum Blvd
Fort Wayne, IN 46808
Represented By
Forge Industrial Staffing, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Emerald Capital Advisors
Represented By
Patrick A. Jackson
Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Wednesday, November 04, 2020
29 29 notice Dismissal - Notice Wed 11/04 10:33 AM
Notice of Dismissal with Prejudice Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Withdrawal - Notice Wed 11/04 10:27 AM
Notice of Withdrawal of Satisfaction of Judgment Related [+] Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-] 27
court Close Adversary Case Wed 11/04 1:07 PM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-50233 Closed (NAB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 03, 2020
27 27 notice Satisfaction of Judgment Tue 11/03 5:01 PM
Satisfaction of Judgment Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-]
Sunday, August 16, 2020
26 26 11 pgs order Order Sun 08/16 4:49 PM
Order Approving Stipulation, Reopening Adversary Proceeding, And Vacating Default Related [+] Order Signed on 8/16/2020. (CMB)
Related: [-] 25
Thursday, August 13, 2020
25 25 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Thu 08/13 2:47 PM
Certification of Counsel regarding Approval of Stipulation, Opening Adversary Proceeding, and Vacating Default Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors. (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
Thursday, July 30, 2020
24 24 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Adv) Thu 07/30 6:27 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on August 4, 2020 - HEARING CANCELLED Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 29, 2020
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 07/30 12:43 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 07/29/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21
Tuesday, July 28, 2020
22 22 misc Certificate of Service Tue 07/28 5:05 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors. (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-] 19
Monday, July 27, 2020
21 21 court VAN-433b Default Judgment - NO Interest Mon 07/27 9:43 AM
Default Judgment Against Forge Industrial Staffing Inc. Related [+] Tickle due by: 8/10/2020. Signed on 7/27/2020. (SH)
Related: [-] 19
Saturday, July 25, 2020
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 07/26 12:39 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 07/25/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18
Friday, July 24, 2020
19 19 motion Request for Entry of Default Judgment (Adv) Fri 07/24 6:40 PM
Request for Entry of Default Judgment Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors. (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 23, 2020
18 18 court VAN-431 Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 07/23 3:03 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Forge Industrial Staffing, Inc. Related [+] Signed on 7/23/2020. (NAB)
Related: [-] 17
Wednesday, July 22, 2020
17 17 motion Request for Entry of Default (Adv) Wed 07/22 5:44 PM
Request for Entry of Default Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors. (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 19, 2020
16 16 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Adv) Fri 06/19 5:02 PM
Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on June 22, 2020 at 11:00 A.M. (ET) Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 30, 2020
15 15 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Thu 04/30 6:08 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors. (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 11, 2020
14 14 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 03/11 4:39 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors. Hearing scheduled for 3/16/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2020
13 13 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 01/30 5:47 PM
Affidavit of Service of Cathy M. Greer, Paralegal at Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors. (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Rescheduled Hearing - Notice Thu 01/30 10:32 AM
Notice of Rescheduled Hearing Notice of Rescheduled Date and Time of Hearing Hearing Originally Scheduled for February 10, 2020 has been rescheduled. Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors. Hearing scheduled for 3/16/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2020
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Tue 01/28 7:37 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors. (Jackson, Patrick)
Related: [-] 1 ,9
Monday, January 27, 2020
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Mon 01/27 8:32 PM
Amended Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors. (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-] 9
Friday, December 06, 2019
9 9 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Fri 12/06 7:52 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Forge Industrial Staffing, Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 2/10/2020 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 2/4/2020. (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Monday, September 09, 2019
8 8 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Mon 09/09 3:45 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors. Hearing scheduled for 9/12/2019 at 12:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2019
7 7 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 08/30 4:30 PM
Affidavit of Service of Cathy M. Greer, Paralegal at Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors. (Jackson, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2019
6 6 5 pgs order Order Thu 08/29 3:02 PM
Order Approving Motion of the Plaintiff for an Order Extending Deadline to Effect Service of Original Process - Order Signed on 8/29/2019 (LJJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2019
5 5 misc Certificate of No Objection(Multi) Wed 08/28 11:13 AM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Order Extending Deadline to Effect Service of Original Process Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors. (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2019
4 4 misc Affidavit of Service Tue 08/27 5:00 PM
Affidavit of Service of Cathy Greer, Paralegal at Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors. (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2019
3 3 motion Extend - Motion Fri 08/09 7:19 PM
Motion to Extend Time Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Order Extending Deadline for Service of Original Process Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors.. (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2019
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 05/14 10:41 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 19-50233 LSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9306914, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Tue 05/14 10:06 PM
Adversary case 19-50233 Complaint Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers of Property Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502(d) by Emerald Capital Advisors, in its capacity as Plan Administrator against Forge Industrial Staffing, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)). AP Summons Served due date: 08/12/2019. (Jackson, Patrick)
Related: [-]