Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-11101

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurie Selber Silverstein
Case #: 1:19-ap-50237
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:May 14, 2019
Terminated:Aug 10, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Precision Industries, Inc.
3002 East Coast Street
Flint, MI 48506
Represented By
Precision Industries, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Emerald Capital Advisors
Represented By
Patrick A. Jackson
Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Monday, August 10, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Mon 08/10 10:48 AM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-50237 Closed (NAB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 30, 2020
25 25 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Adv) Thu 07/30 6:29 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on August 4, 2020 - HEARING CANCELLED Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 29, 2020
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 07/30 12:43 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 07/29/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 22
Tuesday, July 28, 2020
23 23 misc Certificate of Service Tue 07/28 5:02 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors. (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-] 20
Monday, July 27, 2020
22 22 court VAN-433b Default Judgment - NO Interest Mon 07/27 9:18 AM
Default Judgment Against Precision Industries Inc. Related [+] Tickle due by: 8/10/2020. Signed on 7/27/2020. (SH)
Related: [-] 20
Saturday, July 25, 2020
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 07/26 12:39 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 07/25/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19
Friday, July 24, 2020
20 20 motion Request for Entry of Default Judgment (Adv) Fri 07/24 6:25 PM
Request for Entry of Default Judgment Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors. (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 23, 2020
19 19 court VAN-431 Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 07/23 2:59 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant of Precision Industries, Inc. Related [+] Signed on 7/23/2020. (NAB)
Related: [-] 18
Wednesday, July 22, 2020
18 18 motion Request for Entry of Default (Adv) Wed 07/22 5:41 PM
Request for Entry of Default Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors. (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 19, 2020
17 17 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Adv) Fri 06/19 3:03 PM
Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on June 22, 2020 at 11:00 A.M. (ET) Related [+] Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-] 16
Thursday, June 18, 2020
16 16 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Adv) Thu 06/18 5:28 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on June 22, 2020 at 11:00 A.M. Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 30, 2020
15 15 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Thu 04/30 6:12 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors. (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 11, 2020
14 14 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 03/11 4:39 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors. Hearing scheduled for 3/16/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2020
13 13 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 01/30 5:47 PM
Affidavit of Service of Cathy M. Greer, Paralegal at Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors. (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Rescheduled Hearing - Notice Thu 01/30 10:32 AM
Notice of Rescheduled Hearing Notice of Rescheduled Date and Time of Hearing Hearing Originally Scheduled for February 10, 2020 has been rescheduled. Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors. Hearing scheduled for 3/16/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2020
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Tue 01/28 7:00 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors. (Jackson, Patrick)
Related: [-] 1 ,9
Monday, January 27, 2020
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Mon 01/27 8:44 PM
Amended Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors. (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-] 9
Friday, December 06, 2019
9 9 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Fri 12/06 9:00 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Precision Industries, Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 2/10/2020 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 2/4/2020. (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Monday, September 09, 2019
8 8 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Mon 09/09 3:45 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors. Hearing scheduled for 9/12/2019 at 12:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2019
7 7 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 08/30 4:30 PM
Affidavit of Service of Cathy M. Greer, Paralegal at Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors. (Jackson, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2019
6 6 5 pgs order Order Thu 08/29 3:02 PM
Order Approving Motion of the Plaintiff for an Order Extending Deadline to Effect Service of Original Process - Order Signed on 8/29/2019 (LJJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2019
5 5 misc Certificate of No Objection(Multi) Wed 08/28 11:13 AM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Order Extending Deadline to Effect Service of Original Process Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors. (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2019
4 4 misc Affidavit of Service Tue 08/27 5:00 PM
Affidavit of Service of Cathy Greer, Paralegal at Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors. (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2019
3 3 motion Extend - Motion Fri 08/09 7:19 PM
Motion to Extend Time Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Order Extending Deadline for Service of Original Process Filed by Emerald Capital Advisors.. (Argentina, Jr., Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2019
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 05/14 10:41 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 19-50237 LSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9306914, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Tue 05/14 10:22 PM
Adversary case 19-50237 Complaint Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers of Property Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502(d) by Emerald Capital Advisors, in its capacity as Plan Administrator against Precision Industries, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)). AP Summons Served due date: 08/12/2019. (Jackson, Patrick)
Related: [-]