Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:19-bk-50861

Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Craig A Gargotta
Case #: 5:19-ap-05023
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:May 16, 2019
Terminated:Nov 21, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Ace Funding Source, LLC, Defendant
90 State St. #700, OFfice 40
Albany, NY 12207
Represented By
Ace Funding Source, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Super Hero Home Heath,LLC, Plaintiff
8700 Crownhill #105
San Antonio, TX 78209
Represented By
Martin Warren Seidler
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 1:11 PM CDT
Monday, December 02, 2019
court Docket Call Held (Adversary) Tue 12/03 1:59 PM
Docket Call Held. ***ORDER DISMISSING ADVERSARY CASE EOD 11/21/19***. Related [+] (Gomez, Becky)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 19-05023 Complaint filed by Super Hero Home Heath,LLC (attorneys Martin Warren Seidler, Martin Warren Seidler) against Ace Funding Source, LLC (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)
Saturday, November 23, 2019
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 11/23 11:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 11/23/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21 Order Dismissing Adversary Case With Prejudice (related document(s):20 Agreed Motion to Dismiss Case Filed by Elizabeth Grace Smith for Defendant Ace Funding Source, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)) (Order entered on 11/21/2019)
Thursday, November 21, 2019
21 21 order AP-Dismiss Case (PDF) Thu 11/21 11:24 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Case With Prejudice Related [+] (Order entered on 11/21/2019) (Gomez, Becky)
Related: [-] 20 Agreed Motion to Dismiss Case Filed by Elizabeth Grace Smith for Defendant Ace Funding Source, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
court Close Adversary Case Thu 11/21 12:57 PM
Adversary Case Closed for Statistical Purposes Only (Gomez, Becky)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2019
20 20 motion Dismiss Case (Adversary) Wed 11/20 11:56 AM
Agreed Motion to Dismiss Case Filed by Elizabeth Grace Smith for Defendant Ace Funding Source, LLC. (Smith, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, August 27, 2019
19 19 misc ~Document (Adversary) Tue 08/27 2:47 PM
Notice of Attorney Unavailability filed by Elizabeth Grace Smith for Defendant Ace Funding Source, LLC (Smith, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2019
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 08/16 11:33 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 08/16/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Order Allowing Extension of Time, (related document(s):12 Agreed Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines and Docket Call Date Filed by Elizabeth Grace Smith for Defendant Ace Funding Source, LLC. (Smith, Elizabeth) Modified on 8/5/2019 .) Discovery due 11/8/2019, Dispositive Motions Due By 11/18/2019, DOCKET CALL SET FOR 12/2/19 AT 1:30 P.M.. (Order entered on 8/14/2019)
Thursday, August 15, 2019
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 08/15 11:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 08/15/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Order Vacating (related document(s):13 Order Allowing (related document(s):12 Agreed Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines and Docket Call Date Filed by Elizabeth Grace Smith for Defendant Ace Funding Source, LLC. (Smith, Elizabeth) Modified on 8/5/2019 .) Discovery due 11/8/2019, Docket Call Set for 12/6/19; Dispositive Motions Due By 11/18/2019. (Order entered on 8/5/2019)) (Order entered on 8/13/2019)
court Docket Call Continued/Reset (NO FORM) (Adversary) Thu 08/15 12:40 PM
Docket Call CONTINUED to Consider and Act Upon the Following: Related [+] Docket Call Set For 12/2/2019 at 01:30 PM at SA Courtroom 3 ***SET PER AGREED ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES*** (Elizondo, Lisa)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 19-05023 Complaint filed by Super Hero Home Heath,LLC (attorneys Martin Warren Seidler, Martin Warren Seidler) against Ace Funding Source, LLC (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)
Wednesday, August 14, 2019
16 16 order AP-Extend Time (PDF) Wed 08/14 3:23 PM
Order Allowing Extension of Time, Related [+] Discovery due 11/8/2019, Dispositive Motions Due By 11/18/2019, DOCKET CALL SET FOR 12/2/19 AT 1:30 P.M.. (Order entered on 8/14/2019) (Gomez, Becky)
Related: [-] 12 Agreed Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines and Docket Call Date Filed by Elizabeth Grace Smith for Defendant Ace Funding Source, LLC. (Smith, Elizabeth) Modified on 8/5/2019 .
Tuesday, August 13, 2019
15 15 order AP-Vacate Order (PDF) Tue 08/13 3:05 PM
Order Vacating Related [+] (Order entered on 8/13/2019) (Gomez, Becky)
Related: [-] 13 Order Allowing (related document(s):12 Agreed Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines and Docket Call Date Filed by Elizabeth Grace Smith for Defendant Ace Funding Source, LLC. (Smith, Elizabeth) Modified on 8/5/2019 .) Discovery due 11/8/2019, Docket Call Set for 12/6/19; Dispositive Motions Due By 11/18/2019. (Order entered on 8/5/2019)
Wednesday, August 07, 2019
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 08/07 11:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 08/07/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order Allowing (related document(s):12 Agreed Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines and Docket Call Date Filed by Elizabeth Grace Smith for Defendant Ace Funding Source, LLC. (Smith, Elizabeth) Modified on 8/5/2019 .) Discovery due 11/8/2019, Docket Call Set for 12/6/19; Dispositive Motions Due By 11/18/2019. (Order entered on 8/5/2019)
Monday, August 05, 2019
13 13 order AP-Extend Time (PDF) Mon 08/05 3:29 PM
Order Allowing Related [+] Discovery due 11/8/2019, Docket Call Set for 12/6/19; Dispositive Motions Due By 11/18/2019. (Order entered on 8/5/2019) (Hernandez, Rachel)
Related: [-] 12 Agreed Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines and Docket Call Date Filed by Elizabeth Grace Smith for Defendant Ace Funding Source, LLC. (Smith, Elizabeth) Modified on 8/5/2019 .
12 12 motion Extend Time (Adversary) Mon 08/05 12:15 PM
Agreed Motion to Extend Time, Filed by Elizabeth Grace Smith for Defendant Ace Funding Source, LLC. (Smith, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2019
11 11 misc ~Document (Adversary) Tue 06/25 3:54 PM
Plaintiff, Super Hero Kids Home Health, LLC's Rule 7026 Disclosures to Defendant filed by Martin Warren Seidler for Plaintiff Super Hero Kids Home Health, LLC (Seidler, Martin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 19, 2019
10 10 misc Statement Regarding Consent Wed 06/19 2:51 PM
First Statement Regarding Consent filed by Martin Warren Seidler for Plaintiff Super Hero Kids Home Health, LLC (Seidler, Martin)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2019
9 9 cmp Adversary Summons Served Fri 06/14 2:58 PM
Summons Served on Super Hero Kids Home Health, LLC - served on 5/20/2019 (Seidler, Martin)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2019
8 8 order AP-Scheduling Order (F) Mon 06/10 2:29 PM
Scheduling Order Related [+] Docket Call Set For 10/7/2019 at 01:30 PM at SA Courtroom 3 Discovery due 9/9/2019, Pre-Trial Order due by 9/30/2019, Dispositive Motions Due By 9/18/2019. (Order entered on 6/10/2019) (Elizondo, Lisa)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 19-05023 Complaint filed by Super Hero Home Heath,LLC (attorneys Martin Warren Seidler, Martin Warren Seidler) against Ace Funding Source, LLC (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property))). (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Coversheet)
Saturday, June 08, 2019
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 06/08 11:41 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 06/08/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (Order entered on 6/6/2019)
Thursday, June 06, 2019
6 6 misc Statement Regarding Consent Thu 06/06 2:43 PM
Statement Regarding Consent filed by Elizabeth Grace Smith for Defendant Ace Funding Source, LLC (Smith, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
5 5 order AP-Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (F-pdf) Thu 06/06 11:46 AM
Order Requiring Statement Regarding Consent (Order entered on 6/6/2019) (Luna, Emilio)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2019
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 06/05 3:42 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Ace Funding Source, LLC (Smith, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2019
3 3 court Request For Summons (Auto) Thu 05/16 2:33 PM
Summons Issued on Ace Funding Source, LLC Answer Due 06/17/2019 (Seidler, Martin)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (Auto) Thu 05/16 2:27 PM
Summons Issued on Ace Funding Source, LLC Answer Due 06/17/2019 (Seidler, Martin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 05/16 2:27 PM
Adversary case 19-05023 Complaint filed by Super Hero Home Heath,LLC (attorneys Martin Warren Seidler, Martin Warren Seidler) against Ace Funding Source, LLC (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property))). (Seidler, Martin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Coversheet