Tonina v. Revenue Services
Connecticut District Court | |
Judge: | Vanessa L Bryant |
Case #: | 3:19-cv-00794 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | May 23, 2019 |
Terminated: | Feb 24, 2020 |
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 19, 2019 3:16 AM EST |
Defendant
Dept. of Revenue Services
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Theresa Tonina
116 Main Street
Kensington, CT 06037 |
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, May 04, 2022 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Letter
Wed 05/04 3:15 PM
Letter from Theresa Tonina Dated 5/4/2022 Re: copy of letter from the Department of Revenue Services (Imbriani, Susan) |
|
Wednesday, April 20, 2022 | ||
35 | 35
appeal
Document Forwarded to the Court of Appeals
Fri 04/22 12:04 PM
letter/appeal notice with attachment forwarded to the Court of Appeals. (Velez, F.) |
|
Wednesday, December 08, 2021 | ||
34 | 34
appeal
USCA Mandate
Wed 12/08 4:43 PM
MANDATE of USCA dated 12/8/2021 Dismissing31 Notice of Appeal filed by Theresa Tonina. (Velez, F.) |
|
Friday, August 20, 2021 | ||
33 | 33
appeal
USCA Mandate
Mon 08/23 8:48 AM
MANDATE of USCA dated 8/20/2021 Affirming District Court Judgment re29 Notice of Appeal filed by Theresa Tonina. (Agati, Kathryn) |
|
Tuesday, July 13, 2021 | ||
32 | 32
appeal
Clerk's Certificate re: Notice of Appeal
Tue 07/13 3:00 PM
CLERK'S CERTIFICATE RE: INDEX AND RECORD ON APPEAL re:31 Notice of Appeal. The attached docket sheet is hereby certified as the entire Index/Record on Appeal in this matter and electronically sent to the Court of Appeals, with the exception of any manually filed documents as noted below. Robin D. Tabora, Clerk. Documents manually filed not included in this transmission: None. (Velez, F.) |
|
31 | 31
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Tue 07/13 2:57 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to Final Decision28 , by Theresa Tonina. (Velez, F.) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
Friday, March 20, 2020 | ||
30 | 30
appeal
Clerk's Certificate re: Notice of Appeal
Fri 03/20 12:31 PM
CLERK'S CERTIFICATE RE: INDEX AND RECORD ON APPEAL re:29 Notice of Appeal. The attached docket sheet is hereby certified as the entire Index/Record on Appeal in this matter and electronically sent to the Court of Appeals, with the exception of any manually filed documents as noted below. Robin D. Tabora, Clerk. Documents manually filed not included in this transmission: None. (Velez, F.) |
|
29 | 29
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Fri 03/20 12:28 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to27 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Stay, by Theresa Tonina. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number CTXH00016785. (Velez, F.) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment | ||
Monday, February 24, 2020 | ||
28 | 28
order
Judgment
Mon 02/24 12:55 PM
JUDGMENT. For appeal forms please go to the following website: www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/appeals_forms. Signed by Clerk on 2/24/2020. (Shafer, J.) |
|
27 | 27
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Stay
Mon 02/24 12:48 PM
ORDER granting19 Motion to Dismiss for the reasons set forth in the attached PDF. The Court dismisses this case with prejudice. The21 Motion to Stay Rule 26 Requirements and Discovery is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/24/2020. (Shafer, J.) |
|
notice
Judicial Evaluation Program Survey
Mon 02/24 12:58 PM
JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Shafer, J.) |
||
Monday, December 16, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
respm
Objection
Tue 12/17 9:44 AM
OBJECTION re19 MOTION to Dismiss under Rule 12(b)(1) and Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Theresa Tonina.(Murphy, Tatihana) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement | ||
Friday, December 06, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 12/06 3:12 PM
ORDER granting24 Motion for Extension of Time to reply to the motion to dismiss to 12/18/2019. No further extensions will be granted absent extraordinary good cause. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 12/6/2019.(Dannenmaier, Katherine) |
|
utility
Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 12/06 3:26 PM
Reset deadline as to19 MOTION to Dismiss: response now due by 12/18/2019 per Dkt. 25 Order. (Shafer, J.) |
||
Tuesday, December 03, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 12/04 2:29 PM
MOTION - Request for Additional Extension of Time until December 18, 2019 to Respond to19 MOTION to Dismiss under Rule 12(b)(1) and Rule 12(b)(6), by Theresa Tonina. (Velez, F.) |
|
Monday, October 28, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Mon 10/28 12:50 PM
ORDER granting22 Motion for Extension of Time until December 7, 2019 to respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss. Pursuant to Local Rule 7(b), the Court finds that Plaintiff has shown good cause for a 30 day extension, namely that she needs the additional time to retain an attorney. Plaintiff's deadline to respond to the motion to dismiss is now 12/7/2019. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/28/2019. (Dannenmaier, Katherine) |
|
utility
Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 10/28 1:07 PM
Reset deadline as to19 MOTION to Dismiss: response is now due by 12/7/2019 per Dkt. 23 Order. (Shafer, J.) |
||
Friday, October 25, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 10/25 3:47 PM
Request for Extension of Time to Hire an Attorney, by Theresa Tonina. (Velez, F.) |
|
Thursday, October 17, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Stay
Thu 10/17 10:36 AM
MOTION to Stay Rule 26 requirements and discovery pending a ruling on the defendant's motion to dismiss by Dept. of Revenue Services.Responses due by 11/7/2019 (Ring, Patrick) |
|
20 | 20
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 10/17 10:17 AM
NOTICE by Dept. of Revenue Services to self-represented litigant concerning motion to dismiss (as required by Local Rule 12(a)), with attached rules (Ring, Patrick) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Dismiss
Thu 10/17 10:13 AM
MOTION to Dismiss under Rule 12(b)(1) and Rule 12(b)(6) by Dept. of Revenue Services.Responses due by 11/7/2019(Ring, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 10/17 10:05 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Thomas Ring on behalf of Dept. of Revenue Services (Ring, Patrick) |
|
Friday, September 27, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 09/27 4:21 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion for Extension of Time until October 28, 2019, pursuant to Local Rule 7(b), as counsel has shown good cause as to why, in the exercise of due diligence, he was not able to meet the presumptively reasonable deadline set by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, in that he was recently assigned to the case. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/27/2019. (Dannenmaier, Katherine) |
|
utility
Update Answer Deadline
Mon 09/30 8:06 AM
Answer deadline updated to 10/28/2019 per Dkt. 17 Order. (Shafer, J.) |
||
Wednesday, September 25, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 09/25 2:02 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time until October 28, 2019 File Answer or Motion Addressed to the Complaint1 Complaint by Dept. of Revenue Services. (Chambers, Joseph) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 09/25 1:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph J. Chambers on behalf of Dept. of Revenue Services (Chambers, Joseph) |
|
Monday, September 16, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 09/16 4:41 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed, by Theresa Tonina. Dept. of Revenue Services served on 9/6/2019, answer due 9/27/2019. (Velez, F.) |
|
Thursday, September 05, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 09/06 8:11 AM
Plaintiff's Show of Cause by Theresa Tonina re 7 Order to Show Cause. (Murphy, Tatihana) |
|
12 | 12
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Thu 09/05 3:39 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Dept. of Revenue Services* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Theresa Tonina* *116 Main Street* *Kensington, CT 06037*. (Murphy, Tatihana) |
|
11 | 11
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Thu 09/05 3:32 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Dept. of Revenue Services* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Theresa Tonina* *116 Main Street* *Kensington, CT 06037*. (Agati, Kathryn) |
|
10 | 10
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Thu 09/05 3:30 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Dept. of Revenue Services* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Theresa Tonina* *116 Main Street* *Kensington, CT 06037*. (Murphy, Tatihana) |
|
9 | 9
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Thu 09/05 3:27 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Dept. of Revenue Services* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Theresa Tonina* *116 Main Street* *Kensington, CT 06037*. (Murphy, Tatihana) |
|
8 | 8
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Thu 09/05 3:20 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Dept. of Revenue Services* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Theresa Tonina* *116 Main Street* *Kensington, CT 06037*. (Murphy, Tatihana) |
|
service
Request to Issue Summons
Thu 09/05 3:14 PM
Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Dept. of Revenue Services. (Murphy, Tatihana) |
||
Friday, August 30, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order to Show Cause
Fri 08/30 10:58 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why this case should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to properly serve Defendant within 90 days of the filing of the complaint as contemplated by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Within seven days of the date of this order, Plaintiff shall either properly serve Defendant or file a status report demonstrating good cause why the Court must extend the time for service for an appropriate period. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). If Plaintiff fail to comply, the Court will dismiss this action without prejudice. Id. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 8/30/2019. (Shafer, J.) |
|
Friday, May 24, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
order
Electronic Service Documents
Fri 05/24 2:29 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of3 Standing Protective Order,4 Electronic Filing Order,5 Order Re: Chambers Practices,2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, and1 Complaint filed by Theresa Tonina. Signed by Clerk on 5/24/2019.(Agati, Kathryn) |
|
Thursday, May 23, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
15
pgs
order
Order Re: Chambers Practices
Fri 05/24 2:26 PM
ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 5/23/2019.(Agati, Kathryn) |
|
4 | 4
order
Electronic Filing Order
Fri 05/24 2:24 PM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 5/23/2019.(Agati, Kathryn) |
|
3 | 3
order
Protective Order
Fri 05/24 2:23 PM
STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 5/23/2019.(Agati, Kathryn) |
|
2 | 2
1
pgs
order
Order on Pretrial Deadlines
Fri 05/24 2:22 PM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/22/2019, Discovery due by 11/22/2019, Dispositive Motions due by 12/27/2019. Signed by Clerk on 5/23/2019.(Agati, Kathryn) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 05/24 2:18 PM
COMPLAINT against Dept. of Revenue Services, filed by Theresa Tonina.(Agati, Kathryn) |
|
Att: 1 Amendments, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Fri 05/24 2:20 PM
Filing fee received from Theresa Tonina: $ 400, receipt number CTXH00015623 (Agati, Kathryn) |