Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:18-bk-00284

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stephani W Humrickhouse
Case #: 5:19-ap-00085
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 11, 2019
Terminated:Mar 02, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Right Way Brokerage LLC
612 McFarland Ave.
Dalton, GA 30721
Represented By
Right Way Brokerage LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Wayne Bailey, Inc.
P.O. Box 467
Chadbourn, NC 28431
Represented By
Christopher J. Waivers
White & Allen, P.A.
contact info
John C. Bircher, III
White & Allen, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
John C. Bircher III, Trustee
White & Allen, PA 1319 Commerce Drive PO Drawer U
New Bern, NC 28563
Represented By
Christopher J. Waivers
White & Allen, P.A.
contact info
John C. Bircher, III
White & Allen, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, March 02, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Mon 03/02 1:36 PM
Adversary Case 5:19-ap-85 Closed (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2020
13 13 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Thu 02/13 12:56 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 02/12/2020. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12
Monday, February 10, 2020
12 12 order Default Judgment Mon 02/10 12:42 PM
Order Granting Motion. Default Judgment as to Right Way Brokerage LLC Related [+] (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-] 9
Thursday, February 06, 2020
11 11 court Deficiency Notice - Attorney (AP) Thu 02/06 11:57 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE to John C. Bircher, III. The referenced document has been filed; however, it is deficient as follows: An order granting the relief requested was not submitted as required by Local Rule 5005-4(4). Failure to correct the deficiencies by the date indicated may result in the court assuming you no longer desire the relief requested and entering an order denying or dismissing the requested relief. Related [+] Due by 2/18/2020. (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-] ument no.9 Motion for Default Judgment as to Right Way Brokerage LLC filed by John C. Bircher III, Trustee
Monday, February 03, 2020
10 10 13 pgs misc Memorandum of Law Mon 02/03 1:22 PM
Memorandum of Law filed by John C. Bircher III on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee Related [+]. (Bircher, John)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Default Judgment as to Right Way Brokerage LLC
9 9 motion Default Judgment Mon 02/03 1:20 PM
Motion for Default Judgment as to Right Way Brokerage LLC filed by John C. Bircher III on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee. (Bircher, John)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Deadline (Public) Mon 02/03 4:28 PM
Deadline(s) Terminated. - Motion Filed Related [+] (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-] ument no.7 Entry of Default
Wednesday, December 25, 2019
8 8 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Thu 12/26 1:00 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 12/25/2019. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7
Monday, December 23, 2019
7 7 court Entry of Default Mon 12/23 10:41 AM
Entry of Default Related [+] (Parker, Wendy)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff John C. Bircher III, Trustee
Thursday, December 19, 2019
6 6 motion Entry of Default Thu 12/19 3:11 PM
Motion for Entry of Default as to Right Way Brokerage LLC filed by Christopher J. Waivers on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee. (Waivers, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2019
5 5 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Sat 11/23 1:03 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 11/22/2019. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4
Wednesday, November 20, 2019
4 4 order Directing Plaintiff to Proceed Wed 11/20 3:53 PM
Order Directing Plaintiff to Proceed After Failure to Answer Due by 12/12/2019. . (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2019
3 3 misc Affidavit Fri 07/19 5:55 PM
Affidavit of Service filed by Christopher J. Waivers on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Waivers, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2019
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 06/11 1:11 PM
Summons Issued on Right Way Brokerage LLC Answer Due 07/11/2019 (Bircher, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 06/11 1:11 PM
Adversary case 19-00085 5. Complaint by Wayne Bailey, Inc., John C. Bircher III, Trustee against Right Way Brokerage LLC (Fee Deferred) (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Bircher, John)
Related: [-]