Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-42726

Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kathleen H Sanberg
Case #: 4:19-ap-04157
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Jun 11, 2019
Terminated:Aug 12, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
IT Supplies Incorporated a/ka/ Atlex.com
5100 Newport Drive Suite 6
Rolling Meadows, IL 60008
Plaintiff
Nauni Manty, as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Bankruptcy Estate of the above Debtors
Manty & Associates PA 401 Second Ave N Suite 400
Minneapolis, MN 55401
Represented By
Christopher A. Camardello
Manty & Associates, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Monday, August 12, 2019
court MNB Close adversary case Mon 08/12 10:21 AM
Adversary case 4:19-ap-4157 closed (Kathy MNBM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2019
6 6 notice MNB Notice of dismissal Thu 08/08 8:26 AM
Notice of dismissal of IT Supplies Incorporated a/ka/ Atlex.com (Defendant) filed by Nauni Manty Proof of service.. (Camardello, Christopher)
Related: [-]
utility MNB Disposition of adversary Thu 08/08 8:48 AM
Disposition of adversary 4:19-ap-4157. Disposition: dismissed without prejudice. (Lynn MNBM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2019
5 5 misc MNB Certificate of service Tue 06/18 4:20 PM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by Nauni Manty.(Camardello, Christopher)
Related: [-] 2 Amended complaint,4 Summons for adversary proceeding
4 4 court MNB Summons for adversary proceeding Tue 06/18 10:45 AM
Summons issued on IT Supplies Incorporated a/ka/ Atlex.com Date Issued 6/18/2019, Answer Due 7/18/2019 (Lynn MNBM)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2019
3 3 court MNB Receipt of filing fee (OTC auto) Mon 06/17 5:01 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by SN. Receipt Number 207899. (admin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2019
2 2 cmp MNB Amended complaint Wed 06/12 3:20 PM
Amended complaint by Christopher A. Camardello on behalf of Nauni Manty against IT Supplies Incorporated a/ka/ Atlex.com. Related [+]. (Camardello, Christopher)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, June 11, 2019
1 1 cmp MNB Complaint (fee) Tue 06/11 3:04 PM
Adversary case 19-04157 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), Complaint without demand for jury trial by NAUNI JO MANTY against IT Supplies Incorporated a/ka/ Atlex.com. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $350 (Camardello, Christopher)
Related: [-]