Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:18-bk-00284

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stephani W Humrickhouse
Case #: 5:19-ap-00097
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 19, 2019
Terminated:Nov 20, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Universal Truckload, Inc.
12755 E. Nine Mile Road
Warren, OH 48089
Represented By
Universal Truckload, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Wayne Bailey, Inc.
Represented By
John C. Bircher, III
White & Allen, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
John C. Bircher III, Trustee
White & Allen, PA 1319 Commerce Drive PO Drawer U
New Bern, NC 28563
Represented By
John C. Bircher, III
White & Allen, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Friday, November 22, 2019
9 9 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 11/23 1:03 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 11/22/2019. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6
8 8 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case Sat 11/23 1:03 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case Notice Date 11/22/2019. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7
Wednesday, November 20, 2019
7 7 order Dismiss and Close AP (Compromise, Conversion, Dismissal of BK Case) Wed 11/20 2:37 PM
Order Dismissing and Closing Adversary Proceeding 19-00097 5-SWH closed . (Angel, Sharon)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Compromise Wed 11/20 2:29 PM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise Related [+] (Angel, Sharon)
Related: [-] 4
Wednesday, October 23, 2019
5 5 misc Certificate of Service (Not for Summons) Wed 10/23 10:52 AM
Certificate of Service filed by Christopher J. Waivers on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee Related [+]. (Waivers, Christopher)
Related: [-] 4 Motion to Approve Compromise With Universal Truckload, Inc.
Friday, September 20, 2019
4 4 motion Compromise Fri 09/20 4:30 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise With Universal Truckload, Inc. filed by Christopher J. Waivers on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Waivers, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2019
3 3 misc Generic Filing (Misc./Free Text - ECF) Fri 07/19 10:24 AM
Notice of Settlement filed by John C. Bircher III on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Wayne Bailey, Inc.. (Bircher, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 19, 2019
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Wed 06/19 2:26 PM
Summons Issued on Universal Truckload Answer Due 07/19/2019 (Bircher, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/19 2:26 PM
Adversary case 19-00097 5. Complaint by Wayne Bailey, Inc., John C. Bircher III, Trustee against Universal Truckload (Fee Deferred) (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Bircher, John)
Related: [-]