Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:18-bk-00284

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stephani W Humrickhouse
Case #: 5:19-ap-00105
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 26, 2019
Terminated:Nov 21, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Sidney Page
P.O. Box 433
Cades, SC 29518
Represented By
Sidney Page
contact info
Plaintiff
Wayne Bailey, Inc.
P.O. Box 467
Chadbourn, NC 28431
Represented By
John C. Bircher, III
White & Allen, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
John C. Bircher III, Trustee
White & Allen, PA 1319 Commerce Drive PO Drawer U
New Bern, NC 28563
Represented By
John C. Bircher, III
White & Allen, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, November 21, 2019
court Close Adversary Case Thu 11/21 11:33 AM
Adversary Case 5:19-ap-105 Closed (Wright, Dawn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2019
15 15 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Thu 11/07 1:06 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 11/06/2019. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14
Monday, November 04, 2019
14 14 order Default Judgment Mon 11/04 2:58 PM
Order Granting Motion. Default Judgment as to Sidney Page Jr. Related [+] (Wiggins, Carrie)
Related: [-] 12
Monday, October 28, 2019
13 13 13 pgs misc Memorandum of Law Mon 10/28 3:32 PM
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Default Judgment filed by Christopher J. Waivers on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee Related [+]. (Waivers, Christopher)
Related: [-] 12 Motion for Default Judgment as to Sidney Page Jr.
12 12 motion Default Judgment Mon 10/28 3:30 PM
Motion for Default Judgment as to Sidney Page Jr. filed by Christopher J. Waivers on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee. (Waivers, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2019
11 11 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Sat 10/26 12:54 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 10/25/2019. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10
Wednesday, October 23, 2019
10 10 court Entry of Default Wed 10/23 10:02 AM
Entry of Default Related [+] (Parker, Wendy)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff John C. Bircher III, Trustee, Plaintiff Wayne Bailey, Inc.
Tuesday, October 22, 2019
utility Terminate Deadline (Public) Tue 10/22 1:31 PM
Deadline(s) Terminated. - Motion for Entry of Default Filed Related [+] (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-] ument no.7 Order Directing Plaintiff to Proceed After Failure to Answer
Friday, October 18, 2019
9 9 motion Entry of Default Fri 10/18 4:14 PM
Motion for Entry of Default as to Sidney Page Jr. filed by Christopher J. Waivers on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee. (Waivers, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 28, 2019
8 8 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Sun 09/29 12:50 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 09/28/2019. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7
Thursday, September 26, 2019
7 7 order Directing Plaintiff to Proceed Thu 09/26 9:12 AM
Order Directing Plaintiff to Proceed After Failure to Answer Due by 10/18/2019. . (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2019
6 6 misc Affidavit Mon 09/23 4:53 PM
Affidavit of Service filed by Christopher J. Waivers on behalf of John C. Bircher III, Trustee. (Waivers, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2019
5 5 court Deficiency Notice - Attorney (AP) Thu 09/12 12:51 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE to John C. Bircher III. The referenced document has been filed; however, it is deficient as follows: A certificate of service indicating service of the summons and complaint has not been filed. If service was not obtained on the defendant(s) within seven (7) days of issuance of the summons, a new summons will need to be issued. In that event, a new summons should be submitted to the court for reissuance. If service was obtained on the defendant(s), a certificate of service should immediately be filed with the court. Failure to either submit a new summons for reissuance or file a certificate of service of the summons previously issued may result in the matter being scheduled for dismissal pursuant to Local Rule 7055-1. Failure to correct the deficiencies by the date indicated may result in the court assuming you no longer desire the relief requested and entering an order denying or dismissing the requested relief. Related [+] Due by 9/23/2019. (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-] ument no.4 Summons Reissued on Sidney Page Jr. Date Issued 8/12/2019, Answer Due 9/11/2019
Monday, August 12, 2019
4 4 court Summons Reissued Mon 08/12 10:44 AM
Summons Reissued on Sidney Page Jr. Date Issued 8/12/2019, Answer Due 9/11/2019 (Angel, Sharon)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Deadline (Public) Mon 08/12 11:10 AM
Deadline(s) Terminated. - Summons Reissued Related [+] (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-] ument no. 3 Deficiency Notice - Attorney (AP)
Monday, July 29, 2019
3 3 court Deficiency Notice - Attorney (AP) Mon 07/29 1:16 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE to John C. Bircher, III. The referenced document has been filed; however, it is deficient as follows: A certificate of service indicating service of the summons and complaint has not been filed. If service was not obtained on the defendant(s) within seven (7) days of issuance of the summons, a new summons will need to be issued. In that event, a new summons should be submitted to the court for reissuance. If service was obtained on the defendant(s), a certificate of service should immediately be filed with the court. Failure to either submit a new summons for reissuance or file a certificate of service of the summons previously issued may result in the matter being scheduled for dismissal pursuant to Local Rule 7055-1. Failure to correct the deficiencies by the date indicated may result in the court assuming you no longer desire the relief requested and entering an order denying or dismissing the requested relief. Due by 8/8/2019. (Gurgone, Christy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2019
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Wed 06/26 11:34 AM
Summons Issued on Sidney Page Answer Due 07/26/2019 (Bircher, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/26 11:34 AM
Adversary case 19-00105 5. Complaint by Wayne Bailey, John C. Bircher III, Trustee against Sidney Page (Fee Deferred) (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Bircher, John)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadline (Private) Wed 06/26 1:20 PM
Answer due by 07/26/2019 (adi)
Related: [-]