Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:18-bk-13774

Pennsylvania Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Magdeline D Coleman
Case #: 4:19-ap-00135
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Jun 27, 2019
Terminated:May 21, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
James Haggerty
377 Pennsylvania Avenue
Towanda, PA 18848
Represented By
James Haggerty
contact info
Defendant
Joseph Haggerty
362 Pennsylvania Avenue
Towanda, PA 18848
Represented By
Joseph Haggerty
contact info
Plaintiff
Christine C. Shubert
Represented By
MIchael G. Menkowitz
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
JASON CHRISTOPHER MANFREY
Fox Rothchild LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 48 minutes ago
Thursday, June 11, 2020
29 29 misc Stipulation Thu 06/11 2:26 PM
Stipulation By Christine C. Shubert and Between James Haggerty and Joseph Haggerty for of Adversary Proceeding . Filed by MICHAEL G. MENKOWITZ on behalf of Christine C. Shubert Related [+]. (MENKOWITZ, MICHAEL)
Related: [-] 1 ,4
Thursday, May 21, 2020
utility Disposition of Adversary Thu 05/21 2:37 PM
Disposition of Adversary 4:19-ap-135 Settled. (W., Christine)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Thu 05/21 2:38 PM
Adversary Case 4:19-ap-135 Terminated for Statistical Purposes. (W., Christine)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 14, 2020
28 28 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 05/15 12:42 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 10. Notice Date 05/14/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #27 )
Tuesday, May 12, 2020
27 27 order Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 Tue 05/12 4:30 PM
Order Approving Settlement by and between the Chapter 7 Trustee, James Haggerty and Joseph Haggerty. Related [+] (W., Christine)
Related: [-] 22
Wednesday, May 06, 2020
26 26 court Hearing Held Wed 05/06 11:12 AM
Hearing Held on22 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 Motion of Chapter 7 Trustee for an Order Approving Stipulation by and between the Chapter 7 Trustee, James Haggerty and Joseph Haggerty Filed by Christine C. Shubert Represented by MICHAEL G. MENKOWITZ (Counsel). Related [+]. ORDER to be entered (G., Eileen)
Related: [-] ,22
Monday, May 04, 2020
25 25 court Document Mon 05/04 9:24 AM
Document in re: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on May 6, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. Filed by MICHAEL G. MENKOWITZ on behalf of Christine C. Shubert Related [+]. (MENKOWITZ, MICHAEL)
Related: [-] 23 ,24 ,22
Att: 1 Certification of Service
Thursday, April 30, 2020
24 24 misc Certificate of No Response Thu 04/30 9:22 AM
Certificate of No Response to Motion of Chapter 7 Trustee for an Order Approving Stipulation by and between the Chapter 7 Trustee, James Haggerty and Joseph Haggerty Filed by MICHAEL G. MENKOWITZ on behalf of Christine C. Shubert Related [+]. (MENKOWITZ, MICHAEL)
Related: [-] 23 ,22
Wednesday, April 08, 2020
23 23 notice Notice of Motion Wed 04/08 10:40 AM
Notice of Related [+] Filed by Christine C. Shubert. Hearing scheduled 5/6/2020 at 10:30 AM at nix2 - Courtroom #2. (MENKOWITZ, MICHAEL)
Related: [-] 22 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 Motion of Chapter 7 Trustee for an Order Approving Stipulation by and between the Chapter 7 Trustee, James Haggerty and Joseph Haggerty
Att: 1 Certification of Service
22 22 motion Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 Wed 04/08 10:38 AM
Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 Motion of Chapter 7 Trustee for an Order Approving Stipulation by and between the Chapter 7 Trustee, James Haggerty and Joseph Haggerty Filed by Christine C. Shubert Represented by MICHAEL G. MENKOWITZ (Counsel). (MENKOWITZ, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" - Settlement Agreement
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, March 16, 2020
court Transfer case from Judge Mayer to Coleman Mon 03/16 1:11 PM
Due to a technical error, this case has been transferred from the Honorable Judge Patricia M. Mayer, back to the Honorable Chief Judge Magdeline D Coleman . (A., Clarice)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2020
21 21 misc Mediation Compliance Fri 02/21 4:35 PM
Mediator's certificate of compliance. Hearing held on: 2/21/20., A settlement of this matter has been reached., Filed by DAVID B. SMITH on behalf of David B. Smith. (SMITH, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2020
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 02/08 12:52 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 10. Notice Date 02/07/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #19 )
Tuesday, February 04, 2020
19 19 order Amended Pre-Trial Order Wed 02/05 8:15 AM
Stipulated Amended Pre-Trial Scheduling Order. Pre-Trial Conference scheduled 8/19/2020 at 12:30 PM at mad - Courtroom 1, Third Floor Related [+]. Joint Pre-Trial Statement due by 7/31/2020. Motions Due by 7/31/2020. Discovery due by 4/3/2020. (W., Christine)
Related: [-] ading Court
Thursday, January 23, 2020
18 18 misc Stipulation Thu 01/23 2:18 PM
Stipulation By Christine C. Shubert and Between Defendants Proposed Amended Scheduling Order . Filed by CRAIG A STYER on behalf of Christine C. Shubert. (STYER, CRAIG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 24, 2019
17 17 court Document Tue 12/24 9:10 AM
Document in re: SECOND MEDIATION REPORT Filed by DAVID B. SMITH on behalf of David B. Smith. (SMITH, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2019
16 16 court Document Wed 10/02 10:05 AM
***correct entry***Mediation Report Filed by DAVID B. SMITH, Related [+]. (W., Christine)
Related: [-] 11
15 15 misc Status Report Tue 10/01 4:31 PM
***incorrect entry***Status Report Re: Filed by DAVID B. SMITH on behalf of David B. Smith. (SMITH, DAVID) Modified on 10/2/2019 (W., Christine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2019
14 14 court Document Wed 09/11 11:28 AM
Document in re: Joint Rule 26(f) Report Filed by CRAIG A STYER on behalf of Christine C. Shubert Related [+]. (STYER, CRAIG)
Related: [-] 5
Tuesday, September 10, 2019
13 13 misc Mediation Acceptance Tue 09/10 9:08 AM
Acceptance of assignment as mediator Filed by DAVID B. SMITH on behalf of David B. Smith. (SMITH, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 31, 2019
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 09/01 12:50 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 11. Notice Date 08/31/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #11 )
Thursday, August 29, 2019
11 11 order Mediation Order Thu 08/29 12:41 PM
Order appointing mediator David B. Smith, Esquire and assignment to mediation. The matter concerns 19-00135 (S., Antoinette)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2019
10 10 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Wed 08/28 3:03 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by SHAWN J. LAU on behalf of James Haggerty, Joseph Haggerty. (LAU, SHAWN)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Joint Statement Wed 08/28 2:04 PM
Joint Statement Filed by CRAIG A STYER on behalf of Christine C. Shubert. (STYER, CRAIG)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 08/28 1:58 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by CRAIG A STYER Filed by CRAIG A STYER on behalf of Christine C. Shubert. (STYER, CRAIG)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2019
7 7 answer Answer to Counterclaim Mon 08/19 10:54 AM
Answer to Counterclaim Plaintiff's Answer with Affirmative Defenses to Defendants' Counterclaims Filed by Christine C. Shubert.(MANFREY, JASON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Service
Friday, August 09, 2019
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 08/10 12:52 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 10. Notice Date 08/09/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #5 )
Wednesday, August 07, 2019
5 5 order Pre-Trial Order Wed 08/07 12:40 PM
Pre-Trial Order. Pre-Trial Conference scheduled 2/19/2020 at 12:30 PM at mad - Courtroom 1, Third Floor Related [+]. Joint Pre-Trial Statement due by 2/1/2020. Motions Due by 2/1/2020. Discovery due by 11/5/2019. Joint Statement due by 8/28/2019. (W., Christine)
Related: [-] ading Court
Sunday, July 28, 2019
4 4 answer|cmp Answer to Complaint|Counterclaim Sun 07/28 7:18 PM
Answer to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses , Counterclaim by James Haggerty, Joseph Haggerty against Christine C. Shubert Filed by James Haggerty, Joseph Haggerty.(LAU, SHAWN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Att: 2 Exhibit
Att: 3 Exhibit
Att: 4 Exhibit
Att: 5 Exhibit
Att: 6 Exhibit
Att: 7 Exhibit
Att: 8 Exhibit
Att: 9 Exhibit
Att: 10 Exhibit
Att: 11 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, July 02, 2019
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Tue 07/02 10:35 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by JASON CHRISTOPHER MANFREY on behalf of Christine C. Shubert Related [+]. (MANFREY, JASON)
Related: [-] 2 ,1
Friday, June 28, 2019
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 06/28 10:08 AM
1 Summons Issued to Plaintiff(s) to be served upon Defendant(s) James Haggerty Date Issued 6/28/2019, Answer Due 7/28/2019; Joseph Haggerty Date Issued 6/28/2019, Answer Due 7/28/2019. (W., Christine)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 06/27 12:28 PM
Adversary case 19-00135 Complaint by MIchael G. Menkowitz, JASON CHRISTOPHER MANFREY on behalf of Christine C. Shubert against James Haggerty, Joseph Haggerty. Fee Amount $0.00 . (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)),(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (MANFREY, JASON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit "A"
Att: 2 Exhibit "B"
Att: 3 Exhibit "C"
Att: 4 Exhibit "D"
Att: 5 Exhibit "E"
Att: 6 Exhibit "F"
Att: 7 Exhibit "G"
Att: 8 Exhibit "H"
Att: 9 Exhibit "I"
Att: 10 Exhibit "J"