Member Case
Lead case is: 1:19-bk-11466

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mary F Walrath
Case #: 1:19-bk-11468
Case Filed:Jun 30, 2019

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Business Health Care Business
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC
150 East Erie Avenue
Philadelphia, PA 19134
Represented By
Mark Minuti
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 4 minutes ago
Wednesday, March 04, 2020
7 7 court Case Reassigned Wed 03/04 11:36 AM
Order of Reassignment of Judge. Judge Mary F. Walrath added to case. Involvement of Judge Kevin Gross Terminated (SH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2019
6 6 claims Withdrawal of Claim-Chapter 11 Tue 12/31 1:07 PM
Withdrawal of Claim #139, Denise Gonzalez, $10,252.88 . Filed by Omni Management Group, Inc.. (Osborne, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2019
5 5 misc Schedules/Statements Wed 08/14 11:40 AM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC. (Minuti, Mark)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Schedules/Statements Wed 08/14 11:38 AM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC. (Minuti, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2019
3 3 order Order-Joint Admin Tue 07/02 3:43 PM
Order Directing Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases. An Order has been entered in this case consolidating this case with the case of Center City Healthcare, LLC d/b/a Hahnemann University Hospital, Case No. 19-11466 (KG) for procedural purposes only and providing for its joint administration in accordance with the terms thereof. The docket in Case No. 19-11466 (KG) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Signed on 7/2/2019 (LCN)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2019
2 2 crditcrd none Mon 07/01 8:38 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 19-11468 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 9364547, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Mon 07/01 7:44 AM
Judge Kevin Gross added to case (LB)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 30, 2019
1 1 17 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Sun 06/30 11:48 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by St. Christopher's Healthcare, LLC. Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 07/30/2019 (Minuti, Mark)
Related: [-]